IMC Diagnostic and Medical Clinic, P.C. v. Medical Protective Insurance Company
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Callie V S Granade |
Referred: | Sonja F Bivins |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00567 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 07, 2015 7:49 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Medical Protective Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Roger M. Alvarado
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Joseph Amato
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Patricia Burch
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Scott Quitman Carver
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Damian Joseph Collins
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Cynthia Renea Crowder
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Michael Rayner Davis
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Adrian G. Divittorio
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
John L. Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Blesilda Quiniones Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Matthew M. Eves
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
George A. Eyrich
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jeffrey David Faggard
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Christopher Joffre Gamard
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
William Charles Gewin
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Marc Shane Gottlieb
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Timothy Paul Hecker
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jocelyn E. Hewitt
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
William H. Hewitt
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
William Coley Hicks, III
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Brian Scott Hollensworth
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Samuel Bennett Slade Hooks
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
IMC Diagnostic and Medical Clinic, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Anita Marie Smith Kemmerly
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
William Roy Kleinschrodt
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Robert Clifton Knizley
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Robert Dorne Lerner
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Charles Scott Markle
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Thomas Corwin McGee
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jonathan Thomas Miller
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Barbara Carlton Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Patrick Leon Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
John Michael O'Dowd
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Frederick Steven Orleans
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Ozgur Oztas
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Hercules Panayiotou
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Lucinda T. Patton
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Richard W. Pearl
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Robert E. Percy
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Sudeep Rao
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Mark Edward Reese
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Theresa Pryor Roca
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
David Charles Ross
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Maher N. Sahawneh
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Daren A. Scroggie
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Laura Anne Shaver
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
David Moss Shaw
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Stephen T. Simpson
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Larry Brent Thead
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Richard Jason Valentine
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Kevin Keith Varden
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Sumit Verma
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jacob Bond Webster
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jason Robbins West
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Almand Joseph Westbrook
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Noah Brice Whetstone
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Terry T. Wilsdorf
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Elizabeth D. Wood
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Bobby Anthony Wrights
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medical Protective Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger M. Alvarado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Amato
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Burch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Quitman Carver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damian Joseph Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Renea Crowder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Rayner Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrian G. Divittorio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John L. Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blesilda Quiniones Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew M. Eves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George A. Eyrich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey David Faggard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Joffre Gamard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Charles Gewin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Shane Gottlieb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Paul Hecker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jocelyn E. Hewitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William H. Hewitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Coley Hicks, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Scott Hollensworth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Bennett Slade Hooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IMC Diagnostic and Medical Clinic, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anita Marie Smith Kemmerly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Roy Kleinschrodt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Clifton Knizley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dome Lerner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Scott Markle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Corwin McGee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Thomas Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Carlton Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Leon Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Michael O'Dowd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Steven Orleans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ozgur Oztas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hercules Panayiotou
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lucinda T. Patton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard W. Pearl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert E. Percy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sudeep Rao
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Edward Reese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Pryor Roca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Charles Ross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maher N. Sahawneh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daren A. Scroggie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Anne Shaver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Moss Shaw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen T. Simpson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Brent Thead
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Jason Valentine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Keith Varden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sumit Verma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Bond Webster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Robbins West
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Almand Joseph Westbrook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noah Brice Whetstone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry T. Wilsdorf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth D. Wood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Anthony Wrights
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Coley Hicks, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dorne Lerner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 14, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 01/14 4:09 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re:14 STIPULATION of Dismissal. All claims in this action are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party shall bear his, her, or its own respective costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/14/2015. copies to parties. (sdb) |
|
Tuesday, January 13, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/13 8:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Christopher Joffre Gamard, Maher N. Sahawneh, Elizabeth D. Wood, Richard Jason Valentine, Robert E. Percy, Matthew M. Eves, Michael Rayner Davis, Ozgur Oztas, Cynthia Renea Crowder, William Coley Hicks, III, Mark Edward Reese, Hercules Panayiotou, Jacob Bond Webster, Adrian G. Divittorio, Daren A. Scroggie, Patricia Burch, Richard W. Pearl, Samuel Bennett Slade Hooks, Sumit Verma, Anita Marie Smith Kemmerly, Barbara Carlton Mitchell, Noah Brice Whetstone, Scott Quitman Carver, Charles Scott Markle, William Roy Kleinschrodt, Thomas Corwin McGee, Robert Dorne Lerner, Patrick Leon Murphy, Theresa Pryor Roca, Lucinda T. Patton, Jonathan Thomas Miller, Robert Clifton Knizley, Frederick Steven Orleans, John Michael O'Dowd, IMC Diagnostic and Medical Clinic, P.C., David Charles Ross, Terry T. Wilsdorf, Jeffrey David Faggard, Larry Brent Thead, Sudeep Rao, Jason Robbins West, George A. Eyrich, Bobby Anthony Wrights, Jocelyn E. Hewitt, Damian Joseph Collins, Almand Joseph Westbrook, Blesilda Quiniones Ellis, Kevin Keith Varden, William H. Hewitt, John L. Dixon, Brian Scott Hollensworth, David Moss Shaw, Roger M. Alvarado, Marc Shane Gottlieb, Laura Anne Shaver, Timothy Paul Hecker, Joseph Amato, Stephen T. Simpson, William Charles Gewin. (Burns, Peter) |
|
Monday, January 05, 2015 | ||
answer
Answer due deadline
Mon 01/05 11:46 AM
Answer to11 Counterclaim due from all counter-defendants by 1/12/2015. (mab) |
||
Tuesday, December 23, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
order
Preliminary Scheduling Order
Tue 12/23 1:25 PM
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/5/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/23/2014. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab) |
|
Monday, December 22, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order - Document NOTED
Mon 12/22 5:24 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement9 filed by IMC Diagnostic and Medical Clinic, P.C. (Bivins, Sonja) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 12/22 4:45 PM
MEDPRO'S ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Plaintiffs by Medical Protective Insurance Company. (Pulvere, Graham) |
|
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order - Document NOTED
Wed 12/17 9:25 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement9 filed by IMC Diagnostic and Medical Clinic, P.C. (erh) |
|
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/16 5:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff IMC Diagnostic and Medical Clinic, P.C. (Cunningham, William) |
|
Thursday, December 11, 2014 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order - Document NOTED
Thu 12/11 1:33 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement6 filed by Medical Protective Insurance Company. (Bivins, Sonja) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order - Document NOTED
Thu 12/11 11:37 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement6 filed by Medical Protective Insurance Company. (erh) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/11 9:27 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Medical Protective Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Medical Protective Insurance Company.. (Pulvere, Graham) |
|
Wednesday, December 10, 2014 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Case Transferred
Wed 12/10 5:03 PM
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (jlr) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement Mailed
Wed 12/10 4:50 PM
Local Rule 3.4 and blank disclosure statement form e-mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. IMC Diagnostic and Medical Clinic, P.C.'s Disclosure Statement form Due 12/16/2014. (mab) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/10 3:07 PM
NOTICE by Medical Protective Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (Pulvere, Graham) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement Mailed
Wed 12/10 2:10 PM
Local Rule 3.4 and new disclosure statement form e-mailed to counsel for defendant. Medical Protective Insurance Company's Disclosure Statement Due 12/16/2014. (mab) Modified on 12/10/2014 (mab) |
|
answer
Answer due deadline
Wed 12/10 2:02 PM
Answer due from Medical Protective Insurance Company on 12/22/2014 pursuant to Rule 81(c) of F.R.Civ.P. (mab) |
||
Tuesday, December 09, 2014 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 12/09 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Medical Protective Insurance Company from In the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 14-903274. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-1671597, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by Medical Protective Insurance Company. (Pulvere, Graham) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Service of Process Transmittal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Executed Affidavit of Tracy Adair, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - All Pleadings Received by MedPro, | ||
Att: 5 Supplement State Court File, Mobile Co., AL 14-903274 |