Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-02167
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 4:09 AM PST
Defendant
Rafael Foley
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Defendant
Mark Coolidge Johnson
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Defendant
Marco Rubio
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas D Hilden
Represented By
Kristin Nealey Meier
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Haley Marie Westman
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Jeng-Ya Chen
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Julia Fleming
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fatemeh Hosseinzadeh
Represented By
Kristin Nealey Meier
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Haley Marie Westman
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Jeng-Ya Chen
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Julia Fleming
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Anthony Blinken
Terminated: 01/31/2025
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/17 8:41 AM
***Civil Case Terminated, pursuant FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and (B), per the filing of Plaintiffs'10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) Fri 03/14 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by All Plaintiffs (Westman, Haley)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
9 9 4 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/31 10:05 AM
ORDER granting Parties'7 Stipulated Motion. This case shall be held in abeyance until 5/13/2025. Joint Status Report due by 5/13/2025. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (MJV)
Related: [-]
8 8 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Fri 01/31 7:48 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Parties Fri 01/31 9:37 AM
Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), Defendant U.S. Secretary of State Marco Rubio substituted for Defendant Anthony Blinken, per7 Stipulated Motion. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
7 7 motion Stipulated Motion Thu 01/30 4:25 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Hold Case in Abeyance and [Proposed] Order , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 1/30/2025, (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/30 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Anthony Blinken, Mark Coolidge Johnson, Rafael Foley. (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 01/07 9:24 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Anthony Blinken, Rafael Foley, Mark Coolidge Johnson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons 2,
Att: 2 Summons 3
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 01/07 9:23 AM
Attorneys Jeng-Ya Chen, Haley Marie Westman added for Plaintiffs Nicholas D Hilden, Fatemeh Hosseinzadeh, per Plaintiff's4 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin Nealey Meier on behalf of Plaintiffs Nicholas D Hilden, Fatemeh Hosseinzadeh. (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Praecipe for a Summons Mon 01/06 12:32 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by All Plaintiffs(Fleming, Julia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for ANTONY BLINKEN,
Att: 2 Summons for MARK COOLIDGE JOHNSON,
Att: 3 Summons for RAFAEL FOLEY
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Tue 12/31 1:08 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s). See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/31 12:58 PM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/30 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Anthony Blinken, Rafael Foley, Mark Coolidge Johnson Related [+] filed by Fatemeh Hosseinzadeh, Nicholas D Hilden.(Fleming, Julia)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8777404
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit