Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-cv-04718

Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kelley Brisbon Hodge
Case #: 2:25-cv-00016
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (REGISTER OF WILLS)
CITY HALL, ROOM 180 1400 JFK BLVD.
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19107
Represented By
ALEXANDER M. OWENS
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
GAETAN ALFANO
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti LLP
contact info
MICHAEL A. MORSE
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN P. SABATINA (REGISTER OF WILLS)
CITY HALL, ROOM 180 1400 JFK BLVD.
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19107
Represented By
ALEXANDER M. OWENS
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
GAETAN ALFANO
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti LLP
contact info
MICHAEL A. MORSE
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMIRHA BILAL
155 E. GODFREY AVENUE BLDG. L406
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19120
Represented By
TIMOTHY P. CREECH
Creech & Creech LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/29 9:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE Pretrial Conference held on 4/16/25. (rf, )
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/29 9:21 AM
ORDER THAT EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/12/2026., MOTIONS DUE BY 2/11/2026., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 2/11/2026. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 4/29/25. 4/29/25 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
11 11 misc Report Of Wed 04/09 2:44 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (REGISTER OF WILLS), JOHN P. SABATINA (REGISTER OF WILLS).(OWENS, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 06, 2025
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/06 11:08 AM
ORDER THAT THE ORDERS FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE DATED 2/28/25 IN CIVIL ACTION NOS 24-5501 (ECF 17), 24-5821 (ECF 17), 24-6787 (ECF 11), 25-16 (ECF 9) ARE VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A CONSOLIDATED FRCP 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY VIDEOCONFERENCE ON 4/16/2025 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/5/25. 3/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/28 5:02 PM
ORDER THAT A FRCP 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY VIDEOCONFERENCE ON 4/16/2025 AT 3:00 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 2/28/25. 2/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/17 12:52 PM
ORDER THAT SEVEN (7) DAYS PRIOR TO ANY MOTION BEING FILED, COUNSEL MUST NOTIFY OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE POTENTIAL MOTION AND THE POSSIBLE RESOLUTION OF SAME. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 1/17/25. 1/17/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/13 2:55 PM
ORDER THAT, UPON THE JOINT MOTION OF THE PARTIES, THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTERS ARE HEREBY CONSOLIDATED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 1/13/25. 1/13/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/10 3:23 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (REGISTER OF WILLS), JOHN P. SABATINA (REGISTER OF WILLS).(OWENS, ALEXANDER) {Modified on 1/10/2025 as per Atty.) (va)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 01/10 1:40 PM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (REGISTER OF WILLS), JOHN P. SABATINA (REGISTER OF WILLS).Certificate of Uncontested Motion Status and Certificate of Service.(OWENS, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
4 4 misc State Court Record - Attachment Thu 01/09 2:28 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. MORSE on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (REGISTER OF WILLS), JOHN P. SABATINA (REGISTER OF WILLS) with Certificate of Service(MORSE, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GAETAN ALFANO on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (REGISTER OF WILLS), JOHN P. SABATINA (REGISTER OF WILLS) with Certificate of Service(ALFANO, GAETAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Fri 01/03 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN P. SABATINA (REGISTER OF WILLS), CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (REGISTER OF WILLS) (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17976104), filed by JOHN P. SABATINA (REGISTER OF WILLS), CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (REGISTER OF WILLS).(OWENS, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Philadelphia CCP Court Docket,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service for Notice of Removal