Consolidated
Lead case: 1:25-cv-00023

Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:25-cv-00102
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 5:34 AM EST
Defendant
Capital One Financial Corporation
Defendant
Wikibuy Holdings LLC
Defendant
Wikibuy LLC
Plaintiff
Storm Productions LLC
Represented By
Steven T. Webster
Webster Book LLP
contact info
Norman Siegel
Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP
contact info
Barrett J. Vahle
Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/26 3:50 PM
ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, [Doc. No. 110], be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as MOOT; and it is further ORDERED that the April 23, 2025 hearing on the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, be, and the same hereby is, CANCELLED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants' Counsel shall respond to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint by April 16, 2025; and it is further ORDERED that if Defendants' Counsel responds by way of motion to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel shall file an opposition by April 30, 2025; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants' Counsel shall file a reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, by May 7, 2025, if appropriate; and it is further ORDERED that the Court will hold a hearing on the Defendants' response, if done by way of a motion, on May 14, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 900, with the hearing held in open court, whereby all counsel may attend, however only Defendants' Counsel, and one of Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel is required to attend. No other counsel is expected or is required to attend, and a transcript of the hearing will be made available. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/26/2025. (dzir)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Tue 01/28 12:21 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Barrett Jay Vahle for Storm Productions LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/28/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Tue 01/28 12:19 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Norman Siegel for Storm Productions LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/28/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 4 pgs order Order Tue 01/28 12:42 PM
ORDERED that the actions Brodiski and Hayward v. Capital One Financial Holding Corporation, et al. (Eastern District of Virginia, Case No. 1:25-cv-00023) (Brodiski), Moses and Clearvision Media, Inc. v. Capital One Financial Corporation, et al. (Eastern District of Virginia, Case No. 1:25-cv-00039) (Moses), Coleman. v. Capital One Financial Corporation, et al. (Eastern District of Virginia, Case No. 1:25-cv-00060) (Coleman), and Storm Productions LLC v. Capital One Financial Corporation, et al., (Eastern District of Virginia, Case No. 1:25-cv-00102) (Storm) (collectively, the Related Actions), shall be, and same hereby are, CONSOLIDATED for all purposes under the Brodiski case number under the title In re Capital One Financial Corporation, Affiliate Marketing Litigation and assigned to Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge William B. Porter (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/27/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/27 8:08 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Barrett J. Vahle and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9971557. by Storm Productions LLC. (Webster, Steven)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/27 8:06 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Norman E. Siegel and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9971556. by Storm Productions LLC. (Webster, Steven)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/28 9:57 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Anthony J Trenga. District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
6 6 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/24 3:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Storm Productions LLC. All Defendants. (Webster, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 01/22 11:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation, Wikibuy Holdings LLC, Wikibuy LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (triv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Tue 01/21 8:41 PM
Proposed Summons for Wikibuy Holdings LLC by Storm Productions LLC. (Webster, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Tue 01/21 8:38 PM
Proposed Summons for Wikibuy LLC by Storm Productions LLC. (Webster, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 01/21 8:37 PM
Proposed Summons for Capital One Financial Corporation by Storm Productions LLC. (Webster, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 7:27 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9958973.), filed by Storm Productions LLC.(Webster, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 01/22 10:55 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (triv)
Related: [-]