New Mexico District Court
Judge:Jerry H Ritter
Referred: Steven C Yarbrough
Case #: 1:25-cv-00143
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Case in other court:Second Judicial District, D-202-CV-24-06449
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 4:31 AM MDT
Petitioner
ADT, LLC
Represented By
Todd Schwarz
Miller Stratvert PA
contact info
Respondent
Michael Sanchez
Represented By
Chance Gauthier
Maier Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Shane T. Maier
Law Office Of Adam Oakey
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Randal Brooks
Terminated: 03/17/2025
Defendant
Safe Streets USA, LLC
Terminated: 03/17/2025
Represented By
Ryan J. Wityak
Resnick And Louis, PC
contact info
Kristin L. Groman
Law Office Of Denise L Amanatidis
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
15 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re14 First MOTION Motion to Invalidate Arbitration Agreement filed by ADT, LLC. (Schwarz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
14 14 First MOTION Motion to Invalidate Arbitration Agreement by Michael Sanchez. (Gauthier, Chance)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
12 12 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Status Conference held on 04/03/2025. (cm)
Related: [-]
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting briefing schedule. Subject to reasonable extensions, motions are due by 04/18/2025; responses due by 05/02/2025; replies due by 05/16/2025. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Michael Sanchez, 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by ADT, LLC. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
10 10 NOTICE by ADT, LLC of Completion of Briefing (Schwarz, Todd)
Related: [-]
9 9 ADT LLC's Opposition and REPLY to Michael Sanchez's Response to Petition for and Order Compelling Arbitration Pursuant to Section 4 of the Federal Arbitration Act re3 Response filed by ADT, LLC. (Schwarz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 NOTICE by ADT, LLC of Corrected Parties to Case Caption (Schwarz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Michael Sanchez voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Gauthier, Chance)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 04/03/2025 at 10:30 AM. The purpose of this conference is to discuss whether the parties need discovery deadlines. The parties shall call the WebEx Conference line at (855) 244-8681 [Access Code 2306 150 0346] to connect to the proceedings. When prompted for an Attendee ID number, press #. There may be a short wait before you are prompted for the Attendee ID number. If you encounter technical difficulties, please hang up and redial or call Judge Yarbrough's chambers at (505) 348-2270.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 21 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), ADT, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Schwarz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 Respondent's RESPONSE to Petition to Arbitrate re1 Complaint filed by Michael Sanchez. (Gauthier, Chance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against ADT, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by ADT, LLC.(Schwarz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9775328 re1 Complaint filed by ADT, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schwarz, Todd)
Related: [-]