California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:25-cv-01394
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 2:59 AM PDT
Defendant
InDesign Data, LLC
Represented By
Jade Briana Baker
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Joshua Hafenbrack
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tekion Corp.
Represented By
Tyler Griffin Newby
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Adam Gahtan
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Erica R. Sutter
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Armen Nercess Nercessian
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Cortnay-Beth Cymrot
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CDK Global, LLC
Represented By
Vineet Bhatia
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Robert Sabre Safi
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Amy B Gregory
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Shawn Lawrence Raymond
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Rachel Schaller
Taft Stettinius Hollister LLP
contact info
Jesse-Justin Cuevas
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Katherine Rose James
Susman Godfrey
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
67 67 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Thu 05/08 1:54 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CDK Global, LLC.(Bhatia, Vineet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 16
Friday, May 02, 2025
66 66 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 05/02 1:43 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tekion Corp. re64 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Tekion Corp.Opposition to CDK Global, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Nercessian, Armen)
Related: [-]
65 65 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 05/02 1:07 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byTekion Corp..(Newby, Tyler)
Related: [-] 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction
Att: 1 Redacted Version of the Version of Declaration of James Bradley Fox in Support of Tekion Corp.'s Opposition to CDK Global, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 2 Exhibit A [FUS],
Att: 3 Redacted Version of the Declaration of James Livingstone in Support of Tekion Corp.'s Opposition to CDK's Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Redacted Version of the Declaration of Tyler G. Newby in Support of Tekion Corp.'s Opposition to CDK's Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal),
Att: 7 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal),
Att: 8 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal),
Att: 9 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal),
Att: 10 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal),
Att: 11 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal),
Att: 12 Exhibit 7,
Att: 13 Exhibit 8,
Att: 14 Exhibit 9,
Att: 15 Exhibit 10,
Att: 16 Exhibit 11,
Att: 17 Exhibit 12,
Att: 18 Exhibit 13,
Att: 19 Exhibit 14,
Att: 20 Exhibit 15,
Att: 21 Exhibit 16,
Att: 22 Exhibit 17,
Att: 23 Exhibit 18,
Att: 24 Exhibit 19,
Att: 25 Exhibit 20,
Att: 26 Exhibit 21
64 64 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fri 05/02 12:39 AM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Tekion Corp.Opposition to CDK Global, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tekion Corp..(Newby, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Tyler G. Newby in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Tekion Corp.'s Opposition to CDK's Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 3 Unredacted Version of Defendant Tekion Corp's. Opposition to Plaintiff CDK Global, LLC's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Declaration of James Bradley Fox in Support of Tekion Corp.'s Opposition to CDK Global, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 5 Exhibit A to the Declaration of James Bradley Fox,
Att: 6 Unredacted Version of the Declaration of James Livingstone in Support of Tekion Corp.s Opposition to CDK's Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 7 Unredacted Version of the Declaration of Tyler G. Newby in Support of Tekion Corp.'s Opposition to CDK's Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Tyler G. Newby,
Att: 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2,
Att: 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3,
Att: 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4,
Att: 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5,
Att: 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6
Thursday, May 01, 2025
63 63 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 05/01 8:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by InDesign Data, LLC re61 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed (Baker, Jade)
Related: [-]
62 62 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 05/01 7:15 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byInDesign Data, LLC.(Hafenbrack, Joshua)
Related: [-] 45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction
Att: 1 Declaration of Joshua Hafenbrack,
Att: 2 Declaration of Dave Lampert,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11
61 61 motion Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Thu 05/01 7:02 PM
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by InDesign Data, LLC.(Hafenbrack, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Unredacted Version of Opposition,
Att: 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6,
Att: 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7,
Att: 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10,
Att: 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11