Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:25-cv-00371
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 10:05 PM EST
Defendant
Michelle King
Defendant
Social Security Administration
Represented By
John F. Rudy, III
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Nadine DeLuca Elder
Social Security Administration
contact info
Interested Party
SSA
Woodlawn, MD 21235
Plaintiff
Unior Capote
Represented By
Michael Alan Steinberg
Michael A. Steinberg & Associates
contact info
Douglas J. Smith
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Bezalel Adin Stern
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Joshua N. Drian
Manatt, Phelps And Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Irish Ellis
Represented By
Michael Alan Steinberg
Michael A. Steinberg & Associates
contact info
Douglas J. Smith
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Bezalel Adin Stern
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Joshua N. Drian
Manatt, Phelps And Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Metz
Represented By
Michael Alan Steinberg
Michael A. Steinberg & Associates
contact info
Douglas J. Smith
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Bezalel Adin Stern
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Joshua N. Drian
Manatt, Phelps And Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Latesia Reed
Represented By
Michael Alan Steinberg
Michael A. Steinberg & Associates
contact info
Douglas J. Smith
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Bezalel Adin Stern
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Joshua N. Drian
Manatt, Phelps And Phillips
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 05/01 5:13 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 28 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' response in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss is due by 5/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/1/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 05/01 3:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Unior Capote, Irish Ellis, Andrea Metz, Latesia Reed. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
27 27 motion Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 04/28 5:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Michelle King, Social Security Administration.(Canning, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
26 26 notice Notice of appearance Mon 04/28 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Canning on behalf of Michelle King, Social Security Administration (Canning, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/14 11:17 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Lydia Jane Jines is terminated as counsel of record for Defendants and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorney Stanton McManus to remain counsel of record for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/14/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/11 12:48 PM
MOTION for Lydia Jane Jines to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants. (Jines, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/05 2:38 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendants' response is due by April 28, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/5/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 03/04 3:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Jines, Lydia)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of appearance Tue 03/04 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stanton C. McManus on behalf of Michelle King, Social Security Administration (McManus, Stanton)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of appearance Tue 03/04 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia Jane Jines on behalf of Michelle King, Social Security Administration (Jines, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing - Cancel Wed 02/26 2:48 PM
NOTICE canceling Rule 16(b) Conference scheduled for 3/27/2025. Case transferred to Tampa. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 5 pgs order Order transferring case to another division Thu 02/13 12:55 PM
ORDER transferring case to Tampa Dvision. New Case Number is 8:25-cv-371-TPB-SPF. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/13/2025. (LF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 NOTICE of compliance re 12 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (Stern, Bezalel) Modified on 2/11/2025 (JG).
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
16 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 15 Order filed by Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
15 15 ENDORSED ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. 5). Under Local Rule 1.04(b), a party "must begin an action in the division to which the action is most directly connected or in which the action is most conveniently advanced." See also 28 U.S.C. § 1406. Only one of the four Plaintiffs has ties to the Fort Myers Division, and the other three have ties to the Tampa Division. Accordingly, Plaintiffs must SHOW CAUSE on or before February 10, 2025, why the Court should not transfer this case to the Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/4/2025. (BB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
14 14 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. DIAL: 1-650-479-3207, Access code: 2316 024 8769. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
13 13 ORDER granting 10 and 11 motions for special admission of attorneys Joshua N. Drian and Douglas J. Smith. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/30/2025. (RCD) Modified on 1/30/2025 (RCD).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
12 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Joshua N. Drian; Douglas J. Smith Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22961673 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Joshua N. Drian. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22961708 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Douglas J. Smith. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
11 11 MOTION for Douglas J. Smith to appear pro hac vice by Andrea Metz, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (e-portal) (JK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION for Joshua N. Drian to appear pro hac vice by Andrea Metz, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (e-portal) (JK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
9 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bezalel Adin Stern on behalf of Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. Lead Counsel: Bezalel A. Stern. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
7 7 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/24/2025. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
6 6 SUMMONS issued as to Social Security Administration. (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Unior Capote, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Andrea Metz.(Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
4 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Joshua N. Drian and Douglas J. Smith of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELA)
Related: [-]
3 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:25-cv-52-SPC-NPM. (AA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Steinberg on behalf of Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (Steinberg, Michael) Modified on 1/22/2025 to edit text (ELA).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin, Social Security Administration (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22931559). The plaintiff declines consent to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Unior Capote, Andrea Metz, Latesia Reed, Irish Ellis.(Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons