Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 3:25-cv-05110
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:14 AM PDT
Defendant
AG Marketing LLC
Defendant
Telehealth4U
Defendant
Secured ID LLC
Defendant
SMART
Defendant
Pro Identity Save
Defendant
Practical ID Protection LLC
Defendant
Oneperk Place
Defendant
My Retail Savings
Defendant
My ID Theft Protection
Defendant
My Family Telemed
Defendant
MK TELE-VISIT
Defendant
ID Integrity LLC
Defendant
ID Core Protection LLC
Defendant
Hyper Fox Enterprises LLC
Defendant
Anthony George
Defendant
Financial Achiever Pro
Defendant
Dragons Fly Online LLC
Defendant
John 1-10 Does
Defendant
Discount and Savings Advantage
Defendant
AutoSaver365.com
Defendant
All Purpose Docs
Plaintiff
Nathen W Barton
E-Filing/Service 4618 NW 11TH CIR
CAMAS, WA 98607


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
16 16 respm Declaration Mon 05/05 7:37 PM
DECLARATION of Nathen Barton filed by Plaintiff Nathen W Barton re15 MOTION for Default Judgment(Barton, Nathen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 A,
Att: 2 B,
Att: 3 C,
Att: 4 D,
Att: 5 E
15 15 motion Default Judgment Mon 05/05 7:35 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Nathen W Barton. Noting Date 5/5/2025, (Barton, Nathen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 04/29 11:46 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Anthony George, AG Marketing LLC (DS)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/29 11:13 AM
ORDER. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's11 motion for entry of default and DIRECTS the Clerk to enter default against Defendants Anthony George and AG Marketing. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (APH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
12 12 respm Declaration Mon 03/24 2:19 PM
DECLARATION of Nathen Barton filed by Plaintiff Nathen W Barton re11 MOTION resolve Anthony Georges and AG Marketing LLCs Answer not filed with the Court(Barton, Nathen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/24 2:17 PM
MOTION resolve Anthony Georges and AG Marketing LLCs Answer not filed with the Court , filed by Plaintiff Nathen W Barton. Noting Date 4/11/2025, (Barton, Nathen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/18 9:28 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant AG Marketing LLC on 2/25/2025 (Barton, Nathen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/25 9:15 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Anthony George on 2/25/2025 (Barton, Nathen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Fri 02/21 12:42 PM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (VE)
Related: [-]
7 7 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Fri 02/21 12:41 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (VE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 9:25 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) AG Marketing LLC, Dragons Fly Online LLC, Anthony George, Hyper Fox Enterprises LLC, ID Core Protection LLC, ID Integrity LLC, Practical ID Protection LLC, Secured ID LLC. (APH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 misc Praecipe for a Summons Wed 02/19 10:28 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Nathen W Barton(Barton, Nathen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons AG Marketing LLC,
Att: 2 Summons Anthony George,
Att: 3 Summons Dragons Fly Online LLC,
Att: 4 Summons Hyper Fox Enterprises LLC,
Att: 5 Summons ID Core Protection LLC,
Att: 6 Summons ID Integrity LLC,
Att: 7 Summons Practical I.D. Protection LLC,
Att: 8 Summons Secured ID LLC
4 4 notice Notice re Pro Se Registration Wed 02/19 10:00 AM
NOTICE: Plaintiff Nathen W Barton has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
3 3 misc Letter Thu 02/13 2:05 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (RE)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 52 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Summons(es) not received to issue) Related [+] filed by Nathen Barton. (RE)
Related: [-] ceipt # TAC 300000782
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet