New Jersey District Court
Judge:Katharine S Hayden
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:25-cv-01252
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
PISCATAWAY TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff
MS. SHENEE CLARKE
Represented By
NORMAN R. JIMERSON, JR.
The Jimerson Practice LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/02 4:42 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/2/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Text Order Fri 05/02 11:18 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference on 10/6/25 at 11:30 a.m. using the Webex platform. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/2/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 05/02 11:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/2/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/07 9:39 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 5/2/25 at 10am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/7/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/04 3:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by PISCATAWAY TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION.(COTTON, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 03/05 9:03 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PISCATAWAY TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/4/2025. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
5 5 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 03/04 5:53 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Piscataway Township Board of Education.. (COTTON, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/03 10:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHENEE CLARKE. All Defendants.(JIMERSON, NORMAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Return of Summonses,
Att: 2 Statement Cover Letter
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/18 10:02 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PISCATAWAY TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 02/14 8:18 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHENEE CLARKE. (JIMERSON, NORMAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 8:11 AM
COMPLAINT against PISCATAWAY TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16018567) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SHENEE CLARKE.(JIMERSON, NORMAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/14 11:26 AM
Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
Related: [-]