Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Referred: Renee Harris Toliver
Case #: 3:25-cv-00395
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2025
Case in other court:Dallas County District Court, 298
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 4:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Paige C Jones
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Clinton James Wolbert
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By
Paige C Jones
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Clinton James Wolbert
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Wolf
Represented By
William L Wolf
Wolf & Henderson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
28 28 respm Response/Objection Wed 05/07 4:30 PM
RESPONSE filed by William Wolf re:8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois (Wolf, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit(s) WLW Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 14,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 15,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 16,
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 17,
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 18,
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 19,
Att: 21 Exhibit(s) WLW Exhibit 20,
Att: 22 Affidavit(s) MAW Affidavit,
Att: 23 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 1,
Att: 24 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 2,
Att: 25 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 3,
Att: 26 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 4,
Att: 27 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 5,
Att: 28 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 6,
Att: 29 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 7,
Att: 30 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 8,
Att: 31 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 9,
Att: 32 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 10,
Att: 33 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 11,
Att: 34 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 12,
Att: 35 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 13,
Att: 36 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 14,
Att: 37 Exhibit(s) MAW Exhibit 15,
Att: 38 Affidavit(s) AC Affidavit,
Att: 39 Exhibit(s) AC Exhibit 1
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/06 2:15 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Fourth Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . Doc.26 . Because this motion is unopposed, only requests two days time, and does not interfere with any other deadlines, Plainitff's motion is GRANTED . Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is hereby extended to May 7, 2025. Any further request for extension of time will require a showing of good cause. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/6/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 3:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois filed by William Wolf (Wolf, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/29 9:31 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Third Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . Doc.24 . Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED . Plaintiff's deadline for responding to Defendants' motion to dismiss is hereby extended to May 5, 2025. Any other request to extend this deadline will require a showing of exigent circumstances. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/29/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/28 2:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois filed by William Wolf (Wolf, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
23 23 misc Amended Document Tue 04/15 1:24 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc, Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Amended Notice of Removal . (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/15 11:08 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Unopposed Second Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . Doc.21 . Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED . Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Doc.8 , is extended to April 28, 2025. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/15/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/14 2:42 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois filed by William Wolf (Wolf, William)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 04/14 11:13 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants [sic] Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Com-Co Insurance Agency, Inc. Opposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Notice of Removal . Doc.16 . After filing this motion, Plaintiffs' counsel informed defense counsel that Plaintiffs were unopposed. Doc.19 . Thus, Defendants' Motion is GRANTED . Defendants are ordered to separately file their amended notice of removal within 14 days of entry of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/14/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
19 19 notice Certificate of Conference Thu 04/10 4:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Conference re16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Clinton James Wolbert on behalf of Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
18 18 respm Response/Objection Wed 04/09 4:29 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc re:12 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Wed 04/09 4:28 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc re16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Leave to File Wed 04/09 4:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal filed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Amended Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/01 10:26 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . Doc.14 . This motion is GRANTED . Plaintiff's deadline for responding to Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is hereby extended to April 14, 2025. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/1/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/31 3:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois filed by William Wolf (Wolf, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
13 13 misc Amended Document Mon 03/24 11:46 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by William Wolf. Amendment to10 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (Wolf, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
12 12 motion Remand to State Court Wed 03/19 11:39 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by William Wolf (Wolf, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
11 11 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/12 10:55 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/12/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 03/11 10:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by William Wolf. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Wolf, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Mon 03/10 3:16 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1- Poltak Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2- Spalding Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3- Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4- Denial Letter
8 8 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 03/10 3:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois filed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/24 10:16 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition, to and including March 10, 2025 , is GRANTED . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/24/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/21 10:17 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 20, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 10:02 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Com-Co Insurance Agency Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 9:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 order Electronic Standing Order - Specific Requirements for Judge Scholer Tue 02/18 9:49 AM
ELECTRONIC STANDING ORDER: Counsel are required to review and comply with the Court's Judge Specific Requirements, which can be found here:[LINK:Judge Requirements] . The Court updates its Requirements periodically. Also, counsel are required to review and comply with the Northern District of Texas's Local Civil Rules, which can be found here:[LINK:Civil Rules] . In particular, the Court directs counsel to review Rules 3.1, 7.4, and 81.2, regarding certificates of interested persons, and Rule 83.10, regarding local counsel. Counsel are expected to review the Requirements and Local Rules before contacting the Court with questions. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/18/2025) (knb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
2 2 qcref Scholer Tue 02/18 9:47 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/17 1:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Com-Co Insurance Agency, Inc., Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-15269823) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wolbert, Clinton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Cover Sheet Supplement