California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00789
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 11:35 PM PST
Defendant
Ismael Robles-Hernandez (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Kyra Aiyanna Sinclair
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Paola Rios-Jarquin
Represented By
Stacey A Kartchner
Law Office Of Stacey A Kartchner
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Brendan Barber
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/20/2025 12:31 AM PST
Friday, February 14, 2025
Arrest of Ismael Robles-Hernandez (no document attached) (ecf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ismael Robles-Hernandez.(ecf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Stacey A Kartchner appointed for Paola Rios-Jarquin. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Ismael Robles-Hernandez: Initial Appearance set for 2/18/2025 before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Ismael Robles-Hernandez: Arraignment of MW - Paola Rios-Jarquin set for 2/18/2025 before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Brendan Barber appearing for USA. (Barber, Brendan)Attorney Brendan Barber added to party USA(pty:pla) (exs).
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ismael Robles-Hernandez (ecf)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ismael Robles-Hernandez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 2/18/25. (ecf)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Ismael Robles-Hernandez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 2/18/25. (ecf)
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Initial Appearance as to Ismael Robles-Hernandez held on 2/18/2025. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Ismael Robles-Hernandez. Bond set as to Ismael Robles-Hernandez (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $1500 cash deposit. The Court confirms the appointment of MW counsel Stacey Kartchner(n/a). MW not appearing and continued to 2/19/25. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 3/4/25 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Arraignment set for 3/13/25 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit.) (Interpreter Matias Pizarro). (CD# 2/18/2025 MMP 25-1:5:00;5:40-5:45). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Julian Bugarin FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
12 12 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Ismael Robles-Hernandez (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]