California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Referred: Peter H Kang
Case #: 3:24-cv-08896
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 6:20 PM PST
Defendant
Experian
Represented By
Kristen Jessica Smith
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenan Thompson
4936 Willowhaven Way
Antioch, CA 94531


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
39 39 order Discovery Order Mon 03/31 9:54 AM
[IN-CHAMBERS TEXT ONLY ORDER]: This case has been referred to the undersigned for all discovery purposes. Accordingly, the Parties shall review and be familiar with Judge Kang's Standing Order for Discovery, particularly Section H relating to discovery disputes, which is now applicable to this case. Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on March 31, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phklc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Mon 03/31 8:42 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang for Discovery. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/31 12:33 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Bench Trial set for 3/ 23 /2026 10:00 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
38 38 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Fri 03/28 4:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 3/28/2025. Court ordered cases: 24-cv-8913-CRB & 24-cv-8904-CRB to be reassigned and related to 24-cv-8896-VC. 24-cv-8913 & 24-cv-8904 to be referred to Magistrate Judge Tse for a settlement conference, and to coincide with the 6/4/2025 settlement conference previously scheduled in 24-cv-8896. CASE REFERRED to randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes in 24-cv-8896, 24-cv-8913, & 24-cv-8904. The schedule below will also be set in 24-cv-8913 & 24-cv-8904. Parties in 24-cv-8913 & 24-cv-8904 may file a motion for relief from the schedule if necessary. Court set case schedule: Last Day to move to Amend Pleadings under Rule 15 due by 7/15/2025. Close of Fact and Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2025. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2026 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2026 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Bench Trial set for 3/3/2026 at 10:00 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 10:47 - 10:54. Plaintiff Attorney: Kenan Thompson. Defendant Attorney: Kristen Smith. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2025)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
37 37 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 03/20 5:12 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Experian. (Smith, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
36 36 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 03/11 2:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION RE 3/28/2025 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2025 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, March 21, 2025, by no later than 12:00PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 03/11 2:24 PM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting AS MODIFIED 32 Stipulation TO CONTINUE MARCH14, 2025 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 28, 2025. (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Tue 03/11 11:47 AM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 24-cv-8904-CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on March 11, 2025. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Tue 03/11 11:45 AM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 24-cv-8913-CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on March 11, 2025. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
32 32 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 03/10 8:28 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Experian.(Smith, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
31 31 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 4:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT correction of first Amended docket against Experian. Filed by Kenan Thompson. (Thompson, Kenan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
30 30 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 03/07 12:27 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Experian. (Smith, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 03/05 5:14 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties are hereby notified that a Settlement Conference is set for 6/4/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a non-public Zoom meeting. Zoom Meeting Access: Information on how to join the conference can be found on the Court's website under the subheading Joining Non-Public Hearings (Settlement Conferences, etc.) at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/tse-alex-g-agt/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 03/05 4:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: Pre-Settlement Conference held on 3/4/2025. The Court shall schedule a settlement conference to take place in June 2025. (Not Reported.) Pro Se Plaintiff: Kenan Thompson. Defendant Attorney: Kristen Jessica Smith. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2025)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
27 27 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 02/26 4:44 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING PRE-SETTLEMENT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The parties are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference is set for 3/4/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a non-public Zoom meeting. Zoom Meeting Access: Information on how to join the conference can be found on the Court's website under the subheading Joining Non-Public Hearings (Settlement Conferences, etc.) at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/tse-alex-g-agt/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
26 26 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/26 3:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Kenan Thompson. Filed by Kenan Thompson. (Thompson, Kenan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 02/24 11:11 AM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2025 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, March 7, 2025, by no later than 12:00PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/24 9:13 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 02/24/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
23 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
22 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Experian.. (Smith, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
21 21 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse for Settlement. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenan Thompson.. (Thompson, Kenan)
Related: [-]
19 19 Order. Signed 2/20/2025 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 15 Stipulation selecting Early Settlement Conference with a Magistrate Judge.(klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
18 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Thompson shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
17 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Smith, Kristen)
Related: [-]
16 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Thompson, Kenan)
Related: [-]
15 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Settlement Conference with a Magistrate Judge by Experian filed by Experian. (Smith, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Experian. (Smith, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
12 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian identifying Corporate Parent Central Source LLC, Corporate Parent Online Data Exchange LLC, Corporate Parent New Management Services LLC, Corporate Parent VantageScore Solutions LLC, Corporate Parent Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian. re1 Complaint (Smith, Kristen)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Kristen Jessica Smith on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Smith, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
13 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Experian served on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/18/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
10 10 Acknowledgement of Receipt for Service from USM. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
9 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Experian.. (Thompson, Kenan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
8 8 Remark: Service packet sent to US Marshals for service (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 Summons Issued as to Experian.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM 285
Friday, December 13, 2024
6 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
5 5 Proposed Summons. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenan Thompson. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (ark, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/11/2024 (ark, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Experian. Filed by Kenan Thompson.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet