Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11488

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet E Bostwick
Case #: 1:25-ap-01010
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
CHESLA
1 Financial Plaza 20th Floor, Suite 2000
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
CHESLA
contact info
Defendant
University Accounting Service, LLC, Servicer
P.O. Box 5879
Carol Stream, IL 60197
Represented By
University Accounting Service, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shirley Ann Ramsdell
68 Spring St Unit 403
Mansfield, MA 02048
Represented By
Lauren Wilder Vandemortel
South Coastal Counties Legal Services
contact info
Ericka Lezcano
South Coastal Counties Legal Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 04/04 4:30 PM
Order dated 4/4/2025 Re:4 Assented to Motion filed by Defendant University Accounting Service, LLC to Extend Time to Respond1 Complaint. THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS. THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY ACCOUNTING SERVICE, LLC, TO FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO JUNE 26, 2025. FINDING GOOD CAUSE FOR DELAY, THE COURT WILL NOT ISSUE A SCHEDULING ORDER IN THIS MATTER UNTIL AFTER THAT EXTENDED DEADLINE. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
4 4 motion Extend Time Fri 03/28 2:11 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Defendant University Accounting Service, LLC to Extend Time to Respond [Re:1 Complaint]. (O'Connor, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 02/26 1:31 PM
Summons Issued on University Accounting Service, LLC Answer Due 3/28/2025. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 02/26 1:20 PM
Summons Issued on CHESLA Answer Due 3/28/2025. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/26 12:19 PM
Adversary case 25-01010 Complaint by Shirley Ann Ramsdell against CHESLA, University Accounting Service, LLC. Fee Amount $0. Nature of Suit(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan))(Vandemortel, Lauren)
Related: [-]