Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Denise J Casper
Case #: 1:14-cv-14424
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2014
Terminated:Jul 28, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Jun 14, 2015 9:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Brigham and Women's Hospital
75 Francis Street
Boston, MA 02115
Represented By
Torrey K. Young
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Geoffrey M. Raux
Foley & Lardner, Llp (bos)
contact info
Michael J. Tuteur
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gretchen Brodnicki
Represented By
Jennifer L. Chunias
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Roberto M. Braceras
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Defendant
Harvard Medical School
25 Shattuck Street
Boston, MA 02115
Represented By
Jennifer L. Chunias
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Roberto M. Braceras
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth Nabel
Represented By
Torrey K. Young
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Geoffrey M. Raux
Foley & Lardner, Llp (bos)
contact info
Michael J. Tuteur
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Partners HealthCare System, Inc.
800 Boylston St 11th Floor
Boston, MA 02199
Represented By
Torrey K. Young
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Geoffrey M. Raux
Foley & Lardner, Llp (bos)
contact info
Michael J. Tuteur
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Piero Anversa
Doctor 42 Commonwealth Avenue Unit 2
Boston, MA 02116
Represented By
Tracy A. Miner
Demeo LLP
contact info
Megan A. Siddall
Demeo, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Annarosa Leri
Doctor 160 Commonwealth Avenue Apartment 212
Boston, MA 02116
Represented By
Tracy A. Miner
Demeo LLP
contact info
Megan A. Siddall
Demeo, LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 28 2015
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court ALLOWS Defendants' motions to dismiss, D. 17, 19. Given the grounds on which the Court allows these motions, the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Maynard, Timothy)

Docket last updated: 08/23/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 26, 2016
47 47 order Order Mon 11:08 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. In light of the Judgment and Mandate, D. 45 and 46, the Court converts its Order of Dismissal, D. 38, to an Order Staying this case pending the timely resolution of administrative proceedings.(Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
46 46 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 8:32 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to39 Notice of Appeal filed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri. Appeal39 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
45 45 appeal USCA Judgment Wed 8:57 AM
USCA Judgment as to39 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri. Remanded. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
44 44 28 pgs appeal USCA Opinion Wed 8:56 AM
OPINION of USCA as to39 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
43 43 notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Wed 4:59 PM
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at[LINK:http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm] (Scalfani, Deborah)
Related: [-]
42 42 appeal Transcript - Appeal Wed 4:58 PM
Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 10, 2015, before Judge Denise J. Casper. COA Case No. 15-1897 The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 10/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
41 41 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 11:39 AM
USCA Case Number 15-1897 for39 Notice of Appeal filed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
40 40 1 pgs appeal Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA Tue 10:02 AM
Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re39 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
39 39 2 pgs appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to38 Order Dismissing Case,37 Memorandum & ORDER by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-5687204 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at[LINK:http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov] MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 8/24/2015. (Miner, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
38 38 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10:00 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Maynard, Timothy)
Related: [-]
37 37 21 pgs order Memorandum & Order Tue 9:58 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court ALLOWS Defendants' motions to dismiss, D. 17, 19. Given the grounds on which the Court allows these motions, the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Maynard, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2015
35 35 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 3:49 PM
ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2015 re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brigham and Women's Hospital, Partners HealthCare System, Inc., Elizabeth Nabel,19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Harvard Medical School, Gretchen Brodnicki. Arguments. Court takes under advisement17 Motion to Dismiss; takes under advisement19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Tracy Miner and Megan Siddall for the plaintiffs. Michael Tuteur, Geoffrey Raux, Torrey Young, Jennifer Chunias and Roberto Braceras for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2015
34 34 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Fri 10:35 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion17 MOTION to Dismiss ,19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2015
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 4:43 PM
REPLY to Response to17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brigham and Women's Hospital, Elizabeth Nabel, Partners HealthCare System, Inc.. (Tuteur, Michael)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 4:38 PM
REPLY to Response to19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School.(Chunias, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, March 25, 2015
31 31 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Wed 10:46 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting29 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Brigham and Women's Hospital, Elizabeth Nabel, Partners HealthCare System, Inc. to this extent, reply not to exceed 10 pages; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Wed 10:45 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting28 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Harvard Medical School and Dean Gretchen Brodnicki's Motion to Dismiss by Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School to this extent; reply not to exceed 10 pages; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2015
29 29 motion Leave to File Document Tue 5:01 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Brigham and Women's Hospital, Elizabeth Nabel, Partners HealthCare System, Inc..(Tuteur, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Leave to File Document Tue 4:04 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Harvard Medical School and Dean Gretchen Brodnicki's Motion to Dismiss by Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School.(Chunias, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2015
27 27 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Thu 7:37 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Megan A. Siddall. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Torrey K. Young on behalf of Brigham and Women's Hospital, Elizabeth Nabel, Partners HealthCare System, Inc. (Young, Torrey)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 3:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss ,19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri. (Miner, Tracy)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 3:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Megan A. Siddall Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5461408 by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri.(Miner, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Megan A. Siddall
Tuesday, February 24, 2015
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 10:32 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss to 3/17/15; granting22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 23, 2015
22 22 motion Extension of Time File Excess Pages Mon 7:43 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 17, 2015 to File Opposition to Motions to Dismiss , Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ( Responses due by 3/9/2015) by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri.(Miner, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 17, 2015
21 21 3 pgs misc Declaration Tue 5:08 PM
DECLARATION re20 Memorandum in Support of Motion,19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION of Jennifer L. Chunias by Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School.(Chunias, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit D
20 20 31 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 5:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School. (Braceras, Roberto)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 5:01 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION by Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School.(Braceras, Roberto)
Related: [-]
18 18 25 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 4:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brigham and Women's Hospital, Elizabeth Nabel, Partners HealthCare System, Inc..(Tuteur, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit
17 17 3 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 4:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Brigham and Women's Hospital, Elizabeth Nabel, Partners HealthCare System, Inc..(Tuteur, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 4:54 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brigham and Women's Hospital. (Tuteur, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 4:53 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Partners HealthCare System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Partners HealthCare System, Inc. for Partners HealthCare System, Inc... (Tuteur, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Tuteur on behalf of Brigham and Women's Hospital, Elizabeth Nabel, Partners HealthCare System, Inc. (Tuteur, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Raux on behalf of Brigham and Women's Hospital, Elizabeth Nabel, Partners HealthCare System, Inc. (Raux, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 12, 2015
12 12 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 8:54 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Harvard Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School. Brief not to exceed 26 pages in length; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
11 11 motion File Excess Pages Wed 11:57 AM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Harvard Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School.(Chunias, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11:52 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harvard Medical School. (Braceras, Roberto)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto M. Braceras on behalf of Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School (Braceras, Roberto)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Chunias on behalf of Gretchen Brodnicki, Harvard Medical School (Chunias, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 07, 2015
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 3:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri. Brigham and Women's Hospital waiver sent on 12/16/2014, answer due 2/16/2015. (Miner, Tracy)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 3:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri. Elizabeth Nabel waiver sent on 12/16/2014, answer due 2/16/2015; Partners HealthCare System, Inc. waiver sent on 12/16/2014, answer due 2/16/2015. (Miner, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 19, 2014
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri. Harvard Medical School waiver sent on 12/16/2014, answer due 2/16/2015. (Miner, Tracy)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri. Gretchen Brodnicki waiver sent on 12/16/2014, answer due 2/16/2015. (Miner, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 16, 2014
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 4:33 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 3:05 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Abaid, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5324060 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Piero Anversa, Annarosa Leri.(Miner, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet