FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, INC. et al v. FRANKLIN COUNTY, INDIANA
Indiana Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya Walton Pratt |
Referred: | Debra Mcvicker Lynch |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-02047 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 14, 2015 10:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
FRANKLIN COUNTY, INDIANA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RENANA GROSS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEVE KRISTOFF
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 23 2015
ORDER granting Franklin County's 40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/23/2015. (MAC) |
Docket last updated: 01/13/2015 3:25 AM EST |
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against FRANKLIN COUNTY, INDIANA, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-3287861)(Rose, Gavin) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Minor Rose on behalf of Plaintiffs FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, INC., RENANA GROSS, STEVE KRISTOFF. (Rose, Gavin) | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to FRANKLIN COUNTY, INDIANA c/o County Commissioners, Franklin County Government Center. (AAM) | |
4 | 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAM) | |
5 | 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, INC.. (Rose, Gavin) | |
6 | 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, INC., RENANA GROSS, STEVE KRISTOFF. (Rose, Gavin) | |
7 | 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, INC., RENANA GROSS, STEVE KRISTOFF. (Rose, Gavin) | |
8 | 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt.6 ). The motion is set for hearing on Friday, December 19, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 344, Birch Bayh Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Indianapolis, Indiana. Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/16/2014.(TRG) |