Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:25-cv-00756
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 5:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Schott Consulting LLC
Defendant
Francesco F Rusciano
Defendant
Brian M Schott
Plaintiff
Linear Care Diagnostics LLC
Represented By
Sean Robert McKenna
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Nathan John Avery
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarbourough LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAGS3 Holdings LLC
Represented By
Sean Robert McKenna
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Nathan John Avery
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarbourough LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 6 pgs order Order Fri 03/28 11:51 AM
ORDER: This Order governs requests to file materials in this case under seal. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/28/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 11:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Francesco F Rusciano, Brian M Schott, Schott Consulting LLC. (knb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
3 3 qcref Kinkeade Fri 03/28 11:07 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 4:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linear Care Diagnostics LLC, MAGS3 Holdings, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (McKenna, Sean)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Francesco F. Rusciano, Brian M. Schott, Schott Consulting LLC filed by Linear Care Diagnostics LLC, MAGS3 Holdings, LLC. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15376323) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McKenna, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet