Arizona District Court
Judge:Angela M Martinez
Case #: 4:25-cv-00155
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 2:06 PM MST
Defendant
ADP Screening & Selection Services Incorporated
Plaintiff
Benjamin Daniel Leon
Represented By
Daniel C Cohen
Consumer Justice Law Firm Plc - Flushing, Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 05/08 10:02 AM
ORDERED that the Stipulation Extending Defendant's Deadline to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. (Doc.6 .) Defendant ADP Screening & Selection Services Incorporated shall have up to and including June 2, 2025 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Angela M Martinez on 5/8/25. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Wed 05/07 4:12 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:1 Complaint by ADP Screening & Selection Services Incorporated.(Uppal, Pavneet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 service Service Executed Mon 04/28 7:04 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benjamin Daniel Leon: Affidavit of Service re: 1) Issued Summons, 2) Complaint, 3) Civil Cover Sheet, 4) Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability form, and 5) Notice of Case Assignment to District Judge. upon ADP Screening & Selection Services Inc. on 04/21/2025. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 1:57 PM
Summons Issued as to ADP Screening & Selection Services Incorporated. (MCO)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 04/04 1:54 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24156074. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Angela M Martinez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-0155 TUC-AMM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Fri 04/04 1:52 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Benjamin Daniel Leon. (Cohen, Daniel) (MCO)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24156074 filed by Benjamin Daniel Leon. (Cohen, Daniel)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet