|
GPO
Sep 30 2015
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on objections to the Discovery Order of the Magistrate Judge, as to Barry J. Cadden, Glenn A. Chin, Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas, Carla R. Conigliaro, Douglas A. Conigliaro (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Jan 29 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion to Dismiss as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13), Douglas A. Conigliaro (14) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
May 03 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 401 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Jun 06 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 404 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2), Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Robert A. Ronzio (10) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Jun 07 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 406 Motion for Sanctions as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Jul 11 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Appeal of the Order of the Magistrate Judge. as to Barry J. Cadden (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Aug 18 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 646 Motion to allow victim impact statements at sentencing as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13) and Douglas A. Conigliaro (14). (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 646 Motion to allow victim impact statements at sentencing as to Carla R. Conigliaro (13) and Douglas A. Conigliaro (14). (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Sep 15 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 660 Motion to Compel as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 660 Motion to Compel as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Glenn A. Chin (2) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Sep 21 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 394 Motion to Dismiss as to Barry J. Cadden (1), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); denying 412 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 403 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 413 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10); denying 417 Motion to Dismiss as to Robert A. Ronzio (10). (RGS, law1)
|
|
GPO
Oct 04 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 359 Motion to Dismiss as to Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 359 Motion to Dismiss as to Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Dec 15 2016
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 755 Motion to Sever as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Jan 31 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying in part 873 Motion to Exclude as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 03 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 885 Motion in Limine as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 06 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part 879 Motion in Limine as to Barry J. Cadden (1); granting in part 891 Motion in Limine as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 06 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 882 Motion in Limine as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 06 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. as to Barry J. Cadden's renewed motion to exclude evidence of autopsy reports, autopsy photos, and medical examiner's testimony. (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 07 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 892 Motion to Strike as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 14 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 907 Motion to Strike as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 14 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying for the most part 895 Motion in Limine as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 15 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 888 Motion in Limine as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 21 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on SETTING REASONABLE TIME LIMITS as to Glenn A. Chin. Each party is ordered to provide to the court its estimate of the amount of time (expressed in hours) needed to present its case-in-chief (exclusive of cross examination). Each side is also invited to provide, ex parte and under seal, additional information to assist the court in its ultimate determination, such as lists of expected witnesses and comments on factors that it believes will affect the length of time required. The deadline for these submissions is March 15, 2017. (RGS, law1)
|
|
GPO
Feb 27 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 933 Motion in Limine as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Mar 06 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 947 Motion to Strike as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Mar 08 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 941 Motion in Limine as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Mar 08 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 957 Motion in Limine as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Mar 17 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. as to Barry J. Cadden. Instructions to Jurors (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Mar 17 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. as to Barry J. Cadden. Jury Verdict Form (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Mar 21 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. as to Barry J. Cadden (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
May 09 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1008 Motion to Compel as to Barry J. Cadden (1). (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
May 16 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. as to Barry J. Cadden's Motion to Compel, Preserve, or Complete the Trial Record [Dkt #1008]. (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Jun 16 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1107 Motion to Intervene and Unseal Juror List as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (RGS, int2)
|
|
GPO
Jun 22 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1129 Motion for Reconsideration as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (RGS, int2)
|
|
GPO
Jun 22 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1004 Motion for Acquittal or For a New Trial as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (RGS, int2)
|
|
GPO
Sep 19 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1198 Motion in Limine as to Glenn A. Chin (2); denying 1199 Motion in Limine as to Glenn A. Chin (2) (RGS, int2)
|
|
GPO
Sep 27 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 1110 Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Barry J. Cadden (1) (RGS, law2)
|
|
GPO
Oct 05 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DIRECTING FORFEITURE (Money Judgment) as to Barry J. Cadden. (Caruso, Stephanie)
|
|
GPO
Oct 10 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1020 Motion to Dismiss as to Sharon P. Carter (7); denying 1019 Motion to Dismiss as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1013 Motion to Dismiss as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Oct 24 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Preliminary Order of Forfeiture of Assets in Partial Satisfaction of Money Judgment as to Barry J. Cadden. (Caruso, Stephanie)
|
|
GPO
Oct 27 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 1245 Motion to Intervene and to unseal as to Glenn A. Chin (2) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Nov 17 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Glenn A. Chin re 1281 Amended Order on Motion of Trustees of Boston University to Unseal Juror Names and Addresses. (RGS, law2)
|
|
GPO
Jan 31 2018
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. as to Glenn A. Chin re 1245 MOTION Intervene and To Unseal Juror Names and Addresses filed by Trustees of Boston University. The list of juror names and home towns is attached. (RGS, law2)
|
|
GPO
Feb 23 2018
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 1391 Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Glenn A. Chin (2) (RGS, law2)
|
|
GPO
Mar 06 2018
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE as to Glenn A. Chin (RGS, law2)
|
|
GPO
Mar 20 2018
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part 1400 Motion for Order of Restitution as to Glenn A. Chin (2) (RGS, law2)
|
|
GPO
May 07 2018
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 1461 Motion to Exclude as to Gene Svirskiy (3), Christopher M. Leary (4), Joseph M. Evanosky (5), Scott M. Connolly (6), Sharon P. Carter (7), Alla V. Stepanets (8), Gregory A. Conigliaro (9), Kathy S. Chin (11), Michelle L. Thomas (12) (RGS, law2)
|
|
GPO
Aug 10 2018
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered on Trial Time Estimates as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Scott M. Connolly, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Robert A. Ronzio, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. Defendants and the government are to file their response to this order by August 24, 2018. (RGS, law2)
|
|
GPO
Aug 31 2018
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Gene Svirskiy, Christopher M. Leary, Joseph M. Evanosky, Sharon P. Carter, Alla V. Stepanets, Gregory A. Conigliaro, Kathy S. Chin, Michelle L. Thomas. (RGS, law2)
|
|
GPO
Dec 17 2018
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Sharon P. Carter and Gregory A. Conigliaro, setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing. (Zierk, Marsha)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered as to Sharon P. Carter and Gregory A. Conigliaro, setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing. (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Feb 13 2019
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. as to Glenn A. Chin re 1866 USCA Mandate. In compliance with the mandate of the First Circuit Court of Appeals, issued February 8, 2019, a list of the home addresses of the jurors who served in the above captioned case was mailed to Jeffrey Jackson Pyle, Esq., of Prince Lobel Tye LLP, the attorney of record for the Intervenor Trustees of Boston University (owner of WBUR). The court has written to each of the jurors explaining the First Circuit's opinion and reminding them that the decision whether to respond or not to press inquiries about their juror experience is one that is theirs alone to make. As a point of clarification, the court is unable to "unseal" the home addresses as directed by the First Circuit, as the District Court does not maintain a sealed repository on its docket of juror identities and home addresses. The list rather has been compiled by the Jury Department from the responses of prospective jurors to their individual juror summons. (Tang, Danni)
|
|
GPO
Feb 28 2019
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1789 Motion for Acquittal as to Alla V. Stepanets (8); denying 1823 Motion for Acquittal as to Alla V. Stepanets (8). (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Apr 12 2019
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1780 Motion for Acquittal as to Christopher M. Leary (4); denying 1822 Motion for Acquittal as to Christopher M. Leary (4) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Apr 12 2019
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 1777 Motion for Acquittal as to Gene Svirskiy (3); denying 1824 Motion for Acquittal as to Gene Svirskiy (3) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Jun 07 2019
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered finding as moot 1776 Motion for Acquittal as to Sharon P. Carter (7); granting 1816 Motion for Acquittal as to Sharon P. Carter (7); finding as moot 2066 Motion to Continue as to Sharon P. Carter (7); finding as moot 1686 Motion for Acquittal as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); granting 1819 Motion for Acquittal as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9). "For the foregoing reasons, the Motions of Sharon Carter and Gregory Conigliaro for Judgments of Acquittal are ALLOWED. The Clerk will enter the judgments accordingly and discharge the defendants." SO ORDERED. (Tang, Danni) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered finding as moot 1776 Motion for Acquittal as to Sharon P. Carter (7); granting 1816 Motion for Acquittal as to Sharon P. Carter (7); finding as moot 2066 Motion to Continue as to Sharon P. Carter (7); finding as moot 1686 Motion for Acquittal as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9); granting 1819 Motion for Acquittal as to Gregory A. Conigliaro (9). "For the foregoing reasons, the Motions of Sharon Carter and Gregory Conigliaro for Judgments of Acquittal are ALLOWED. The Clerk will enter the judgments accordingly and discharge the defendants." SO ORDERED. (Tang, Danni)
|
|
GPO
Oct 17 2019
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 2032 Motion for Acquittal as to Kathy S. Chin (11); denying 2032 Motion for New Trial as to Kathy S. Chin (11); denying 2035 Motion for Acquittal as to Kathy S. Chin (11); denying 2035 Motion for New Trial as to Kathy S. Chin (11); denying 2024 Motion for Acquittal as to Michelle L. Thomas (12); denying 2024 Motion for New Trial as to Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 2032 Motion for Acquittal as to Kathy S. Chin (11); denying 2032 Motion for New Trial as to Kathy S. Chin (11); denying 2035 Motion for Acquittal as to Kathy S. Chin (11); denying 2035 Motion for New Trial as to Kathy S. Chin (11); denying 2024 Motion for Acquittal as to Michelle L. Thomas (12); denying 2024 Motion for New Trial as to Michelle L. Thomas (12) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
May 29 2020
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 2176 Motion to Reduce Sentence as to Gene Svirskiy (3) (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Dec 23 2020
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 2198 Order on Motion for Compassionate Release - 18:3582 as to Gene Svirskiy (3); denying 2199 Order on Motion for Compassionate Release - 18:3582 as to Gene Svirskiy (3). (Zierk, Marsha)
|
|
GPO
Jun 15 2022
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying motions by Sharon P. Carter and Gregory A. Conigliaro for a new trial. The Clerk will set the cases for hearings on a sentence. (RGS, law2)Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying motions by Sharon P. Carter and Gregory A. Conigliaro for a new trial. The Clerk will set the cases for hearings on a sentence. (RGS, law2)
|