Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. Does 1-35
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-01926 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 16, 2015 7:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe 27
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 29
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 3
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 24
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 34
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 35
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 5
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 7
|
|
Defendant
John Madera
John Doe 29 1254 VENEZIA PL
POMONA, CA 91766 |
|
Defendant
John Doe 23
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-35
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 1
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 12
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 13
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 14
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 16
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 18
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 19
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 2
|
|
Plaintiff
Dallas Buyers Club, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Doe 33
Terminated: 04/20/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 25
Terminated: 04/20/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 26
Terminated: 04/24/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 28
Terminated: 04/17/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 30
Terminated: 05/07/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 31
Terminated: 03/06/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 32
Terminated: 03/06/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 4
Terminated: 04/17/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 6
Terminated: 02/04/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 8
Terminated: 03/06/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 9
Terminated: 03/11/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 10
Terminated: 01/28/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 11
Terminated: 06/01/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 15
Terminated: 02/03/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 17
Terminated: 04/07/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 20
Terminated: 03/06/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 21
Terminated: 04/17/2015
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 22
Terminated: 05/28/2015
|