Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-00669
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Handlos Finishing, LLC
1636 190th St
Audubon, IA 50025-7568
Represented By
Jeffrey Douglas Goetz
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Federal Bldg, Room 793 210 Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50309


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/10 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 05/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41
Friday, May 09, 2025
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 05/09/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34
44 44 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/09 12:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeremiah Charles Hollembeak on behalf of AMVC Management Services, LLC..(ccc)
Related: [-]
43 43 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/09 11:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeremiah Charles Hollembeak on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC..(Hollembeak, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
court Corrective Entry Fri 05/09 12:20 PM
Corrective Entry Incorrect Party Filer. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 43 Notice of Appearance & Request for Notice filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
Thursday, May 08, 2025
42 42 misc Support Document Thu 05/08 11:38 AM
Support Document Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC Related [+]. (Goetz, Jeffrey). Modified on 5/8/2025 (kam)
Related: [-] 38 Declaration under Penalty of Perjury filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Corporate Ownership
41 41 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/08 8:55 AM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/29/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 35 Amended Motion(related document(s)6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Handlos Finishing, LLC). filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
court Entered in Error Thu 05/08 9:36 AM
Entered in Error Filed in Error Related [+] (kam)
Related: [-] 40 Equity Security Holders filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
40 40 misc Equity Security Holders Thu 05/08 8:28 AM
Error: Filed in Error. See Docket Event #38. Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (kam) Modified on 5/8/2025 (kam)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc List of Creditors Wed 05/07 4:43 PM
Verification of List of Creditors filed, List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury Wed 05/07 4:41 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Wed 05/07 4:27 PM
Amended List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page Wed 05/07 4:24 PM
Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page. Updated and Corrected Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. Related [+].(Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
35 35 motion Amended Motion Wed 05/07 3:54 PM
Amended Motio Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Handlos Finishing, LLC
34 34 court Notice of Bar Date - 14 day Wed 05/07 12:25 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/21/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 33 Amended Motion(related document(s)25 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) filed by Handlos Finishing, LLC). filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
33 33 motion Amended Motion Tue 05/06 4:20 PM
Amended Motio Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) filed by Handlos Finishing, LLC
32 32 motion Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) Tue 05/06 4:15 PM
Error: Incorrect docket code. See Docket Event #33. Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 U.S.C. § 366(b) Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)Modified on 5/6/2025 (ccc)
Related: [-]
court Corrective Entry Tue 05/06 4:20 PM
Corrective Entry Incorrect docket code. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 32 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 U.S.C. § 366(b) filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
Saturday, May 03, 2025
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28
Friday, May 02, 2025
crditcrd none Fri 05/02 2:39 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors([LINK 25-00669 lmj11] ) ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4899953. Fee amount 34.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 27
utility Fee Due Fri 05/02 12:05 PM
Fee Due Amended List of Creditors $ 34.00 Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 27 List of Creditors filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
Thursday, May 01, 2025
29 29 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:14 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/22/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
28 28 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:13 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+]. Objections Due By 05/22/2025. (accc)
Related: [-] #26 Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC
27 27 misc List of Creditors Thu 05/01 2:03 PM
List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
26 26 12 pgs motion Employ Professional Person Wed 04/30 2:16 PM
Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
25 25 motion Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) Tue 04/29 3:53 PM
Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 U.S.C. § 366(b) Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
24 24 9 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 3:25 PM
Consent Order Regarding Interim Use of Cash Collateral Related [+] (tls)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Use Cash Collateral
23 23 misc Proposed Consent Order Disposing of Pending Matter Tue 04/29 12:04 PM
Proposed Consent Order Disposing of Pending Matter Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC Related [+]. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
Sunday, April 27, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/27 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 04/27/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, April 25, 2025
21 21 court Judge Jackwig Hearing Fri 04/25 6:57 PM
Minute Order < none; instead: Docket Text Order Regarding Consideration of Debtor's Motion for Order Authorizing Interim and Final Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Postpetition Liens at April 25, 2025 11 U.S.C. Section 105(d) Status Conference. Unless the interested parties submit a consent order disposing of both interim and final use of cash collateral, the Court will conduct a telephonic final hearing (no testimony) on the pending motion on May 13, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. CDT. Attorneys of record who wish to participate in the conference shall call 855-244-8681 and enter participant code 1804183819#. Audio Track 1; Appearances: Ms. Quinn-Hanse and Ms. Davison for the United States Trustee, Mr. Goetz, Ms. Eddie and Ms. Holman for Debtor in Possession, and Mr. Moorlach and Mr. Burke for Farm Credit Services of America, PCA, and Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA. Beyond notice of electronic fling, service of this order is waived Related [+] (Jackwig, Judge Lee)
Related: [-] 7
20 20 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions - Order Fri 04/25 5:36 PM
Related [+]. . (Jackwig, Judge Lee)Minute Order < none; instead: Docket Text Order Regarding Consideration of Debtor's Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor to Honor Prepetition Obligations to Employees at April 25, 2025 11 U.S.C. Section 105(d) Status Conference. Having been advised Farm Credit Services of America, PCA, and Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA (together "Farm Credit") agree to the relief requested, the Court hereby Orders that: The motion is granted to the extent set forth in clauses (i), (ii), and (iii)
Related: [-] 8
19 19 misc Support Document Fri 04/25 3:38 PM
Support Document Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC Related [+]. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC,8 Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC,9 Ex Parte Application for Expedited Hearing filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC,14 Support Document filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
18 18 misc Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney for Debtor Fri 04/25 3:08 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
17 17 court Judge Jackwig Hearing Fri 04/25 3:05 PM
Docket Text Notice of 11 U.S.C. Section 105(d) Status Conference (Telephonic, No Testimony). Beginning at 4:00 p.m. CDT on April 25, 2025, the Court will conduct a status conference to review this short filing case in particular and the related ten short filing cases in general. The time allotted for the conference is 30 minutes. Attorneys of record who wish to participate in the conference shall call 855-244-8681 and enter participant code 1804183819#. Beyond notice of electronic filing, service of this notice of conference is waived. This notice has been entered on the docket as directed by Judge Jackwig. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 4/25/2025 at 04:00 PM at Telephonic Hrg with Judge Jackwig. (acw)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
16 16 misc Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney for Debtor Fri 04/25 3:02 PM
Error: Incorrect Document. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/25/2025 (kam)
Related: [-]
15 15 court 341 Meeting - Ch11 - Business Fri 04/25 1:43 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference Call. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/28/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/2/2025. (ccc)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs misc Support Document Fri 04/25 11:10 AM
Support Document Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC Related [+]. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC,8 Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC,9 Ex Parte Application for Expedited Hearing filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/25 10:01 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Thomas H Burke on behalf of Farm Credit Services of America PCA and FLCA..(Burke, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/25 9:31 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Johannes H Moorlach on behalf of Farm Credit Services of America PCA and FLCA..(Moorlach, Johannes)
Related: [-]
court Corrective Entry Fri 04/25 9:54 AM
Corrective Entry Incorrect docket code. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 10 Declaration under Penalty of Perjury filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
court Corrective Entry Fri 04/25 3:08 PM
Corrective Entry Incorrect Document Related [+] (kam)
Related: [-] 16 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 3 pgs misc Support Document Fri 04/25 9:56 AM
Support Document Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC Related [+]. (ccc)
Related: [-] 8 Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC
10 10 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury Thu 04/24 6:27 PM
Error: Incorrect docket code. See Docket Event #12. Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Declaration of Jacob Best In Support of Emergency and Ex Parte First Day Motions Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)Modified on 4/25/2025 (ccc)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Ex Parte Application for Expedited Hearing Thu 04/24 5:59 PM
Ex Parte Application for Expedited Hearing Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Handlos Finishing, LLC,8 Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Handlos Finishing, LLC
8 8 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Thu 04/24 5:53 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' Emergency and Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor to Honor Pre-Petition Obligations to Employees Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 9 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral Thu 04/24 5:48 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs motion Joint Administration Thu 04/24 4:31 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 2:05 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brennan Eddie on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC..(Eddie, Brennan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 1:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elissa M Holman on behalf of Handlos Finishing, LLC..(Holman, Elissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Thu 04/24 11:26 AM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (ccc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Resolution Wed 04/23 6:24 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs court Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Wed 04/23 5:01 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738 Filed by Handlos Finishing, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 04/23 5:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-00669 11] ) [court,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4894591. Fee amount 1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1