Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-00669

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-00672
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC
1636 190th St
Audubon, IA 50025-7568
Represented By
Jeffrey Douglas Goetz
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Federal Bldg, Room 793 210 Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50309


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/10 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23
Friday, May 09, 2025
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/09/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, May 08, 2025
23 23 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/08 8:57 AM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/29/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Motion(related document(s)6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC). filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
22 22 misc List of Creditors Wed 05/07 7:55 PM
Verification of List of Creditors filed, List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury Wed 05/07 7:54 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Wed 05/07 7:49 PM
Amended List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page Wed 05/07 7:48 PM
Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page. Updated & Corrected Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. Related [+].(Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC
18 18 motion Amended Motion Wed 05/07 3:57 PM
Amended Motio Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC
17 17 court Notice of Bar Date - 14 day Wed 05/07 12:11 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/21/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 16 Amended Motion(related document(s)10 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) filed by Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC). filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
16 16 motion Amended Motion Tue 05/06 4:22 PM
Amended Motio Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) filed by Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC
Saturday, May 03, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:16 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/22/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC
12 12 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:03 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+]. Objections Due By 05/22/2025. (accc)
Related: [-] #11 Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 motion Employ Professional Person Wed 04/30 2:18 PM
Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 motion Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) Tue 04/29 3:57 PM
Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 U.S.C. § 366(b) Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/27 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/27/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney for Debtor Fri 04/25 3:11 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 court 341 Meeting - Ch11 - Business Fri 04/25 1:52 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference Call. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/28/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/2/2025. (ccc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 motion Joint Administration Thu 04/24 4:33 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 2:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brennan Eddie on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC..(Eddie, Brennan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 1:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elissa M Holman on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC..(Holman, Elissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Thu 04/24 11:33 AM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (ccc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Resolution Wed 04/23 6:18 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs court Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Wed 04/23 5:22 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738 Filed by Handlos Farrowing - Jacksonville, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 04/23 5:25 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-00672 11] ) [court,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4894604. Fee amount 1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1