Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-00669
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-00669
Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 1:25-bk-00673 |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC
1636 190th St
Audubon, IA 50025-7568 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Federal Bldg, Room 793 210 Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50309 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Saturday, May 10, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Notice of Bar Date for Objections Objections Due By 5/29/2025. (tls) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Verification of List of Creditors filed, List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Amended List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page. Updated & Corrected Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. .(Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Amended Motio . Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Bar Date for Objections Objections Due By 5/21/2025. (tls) |
|
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Amended Motio . Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
Saturday, May 03, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Bar Date for Objections Objections Due By 5/22/2025. (tls) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Bar Date for Objections . Objections Due By 05/22/2025. (accc) |
|
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 U.S.C. § 366(b) Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
Sunday, April 27, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference Call. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/28/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/2/2025. (ccc) |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brennan Eddie on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC..(Eddie, Brennan) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elissa M Holman on behalf of Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC..(Holman, Elissa) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (ccc) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738 Filed by Handlos Farrowing - South, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) |
|
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/23 5:44 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-00673 11] ) [court,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4894611. Fee amount 1738.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |