Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-00669

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-00675
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Handlos Feed Mill, LLC
1636 190th St
Audubon, IA 50025-7568
Represented By
Jeffrey Douglas Goetz
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Federal Bldg, Room 793 210 Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50309


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/10 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24
Friday, May 09, 2025
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/09/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, May 08, 2025
27 27 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury Thu 05/08 4:30 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Support Document Thu 05/08 11:32 AM
Support Document Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC Related [+]. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
24 24 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/08 8:59 AM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/29/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Motion(related document(s)6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Handlos Feed Mill, LLC). filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC
court Corrective Entry Thu 05/08 10:59 AM
Corrective Entry Documents Incorrectly Marked as Amended Related [+] (kam)
Related: [-] 21 Declaration under Penalty of Perjury filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
25 25 misc Verification of List of Creditors Thu 05/08 10:58 AM
Verification of List of Creditors filed Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (kam)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc List of Creditors Wed 05/07 5:29 PM
List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Support Document Wed 05/07 5:25 PM
Support Document Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC Related [+]. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 21 Declaration under Penalty of Perjury filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership
21 21 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury Wed 05/07 5:23 PM
Error: Documents Incorrectly Marked as Amended. Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/8/2025 (kam)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Wed 05/07 5:20 PM
Amended List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page Wed 05/07 5:19 PM
Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page. Updated and Corrected Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. Related [+].(Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC
18 18 motion Amended Motion Wed 05/07 4:06 PM
Amended Motio Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Handlos Feed Mill, LLC
17 17 court Notice of Bar Date - 14 day Wed 05/07 11:59 AM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/21/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 16 Amended Motion(related document(s)10 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) filed by Handlos Feed Mill, LLC). filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
16 16 motion Amended Motion Tue 05/06 4:24 PM
Amended Motio Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) filed by Handlos Feed Mill, LLC
Saturday, May 03, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:18 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/22/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC
12 12 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:07 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+]. Objections Due By 05/22/2025. (accc)
Related: [-] #11 Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Feed Mill, LLC
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 motion Employ Professional Person Wed 04/30 2:23 PM
Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 motion Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) Tue 04/29 3:59 PM
Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 U.S.C. § 366(b) Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/27 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 04/27/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney for Debtor Fri 04/25 3:13 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 court 341 Meeting - Ch11 - Business Fri 04/25 1:57 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference Call. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/28/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/2/2025. (ccc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 motion Joint Administration Thu 04/24 4:35 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 2:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brennan Eddie on behalf of Handlos Feed Mill, LLC..(Eddie, Brennan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 1:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elissa M Holman on behalf of Handlos Feed Mill, LLC..(Holman, Elissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Thu 04/24 11:37 AM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (ccc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Resolution Wed 04/23 6:25 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs court Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Wed 04/23 5:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738 Filed by Handlos Feed Mill, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 04/23 5:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-00675 11] ) [court,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4894622. Fee amount 1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1