Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-00669

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-00676
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC
1636 190th St
Audubon, IA 50025-7568
Represented By
Jeffrey Douglas Goetz
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Federal Bldg, Room 793 210 Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50309


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/10 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Thursday, May 08, 2025
24 24 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury Thu 05/08 4:36 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Support Document Thu 05/08 11:34 AM
Support Document Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC Related [+]. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 19 Declaration under Penalty of Perjury filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership
21 21 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/08 8:59 AM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/29/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 16 Amended Motion(related document(s)6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC). filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC
court Corrective Entry Thu 05/08 11:58 AM
Corrective Entry Documents Incorrectly Marked as Amended Related [+] (kam)
Related: [-] 19 Declaration under Penalty of Perjury filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
23 23 misc Verification of List of Creditors Thu 05/08 12:01 PM
Verification of List of Creditors filed Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (kam)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc List of Creditors Wed 05/07 5:34 PM
List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury Wed 05/07 5:33 PM
Error: Documents Incorrectly Marked as Amended. Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/8/2025 (kam)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Wed 05/07 5:31 PM
Amended List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page Wed 05/07 5:30 PM
Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page. Updated and Corrected Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. Related [+].(Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC
16 16 motion Amended Motion Wed 05/07 4:07 PM
Amended Motio Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC
Saturday, May 03, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, May 02, 2025
crditcrd none Fri 05/02 2:39 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors([LINK 25-00676 lmj11] ) ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4899953. Fee amount 34.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 11
utility Fee Due Fri 05/02 12:08 PM
Fee Due Amended List of Creditors $ 34.00 Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 11 List of Creditors filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:19 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/22/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC
12 12 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:08 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+]. Objections Due By 05/22/2025. (accc)
Related: [-] #10 Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC
11 11 misc List of Creditors Thu 05/01 2:06 PM
List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 motion Employ Professional Person Wed 04/30 2:24 PM
Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/27 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 04/27/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney for Debtor Fri 04/25 3:13 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 court 341 Meeting - Ch11 - Business Fri 04/25 1:58 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference Call. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/28/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/2/2025. (ccc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 motion Joint Administration Thu 04/24 4:35 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 2:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brennan Eddie on behalf of Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC..(Eddie, Brennan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 2:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elissa M Holman on behalf of Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC..(Holman, Elissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Thu 04/24 11:44 AM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (ccc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Resolution Wed 04/23 6:26 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs court Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Wed 04/23 5:56 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738 Filed by Handlos Manure Hauling, LLC. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 04/23 6:09 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-00676 11] ) [court,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4894646. Fee amount 1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1