Member Case
Lead case is: 1:25-bk-00669

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-00678
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Multi Pig, Inc.
1636 190th St
Audubon, IA 50025-7568
Represented By
Jeffrey Douglas Goetz
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Federal Bldg, Room 793 210 Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50309


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/10 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24
Friday, May 09, 2025
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/09/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, May 08, 2025
24 24 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/08 9:00 AM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/29/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 19 Amended Motion(related document(s)6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Multi Pig, Inc.). filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
23 23 misc List of Creditors Wed 05/07 8:41 PM
Verification of List of Creditors filed, List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury Wed 05/07 8:40 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H: Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Wed 05/07 8:35 PM
Amended List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page Wed 05/07 8:34 PM
Notice of Filing Corrected Petition Page. Updated & Corrected Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Multi Pig, Inc.. Related [+].(Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.
19 19 motion Amended Motion Wed 05/07 4:08 PM
Amended Motio Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Multi Pig, Inc.
18 18 court Notice of Bar Date - 14 day Wed 05/07 11:40 AM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/21/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 17 Amended Motion(related document(s)10 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) filed by Multi Pig, Inc.). filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
17 17 motion Amended Motion Tue 05/06 4:25 PM
Amended Motio Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) filed by Multi Pig, Inc.
Saturday, May 03, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 11:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, May 01, 2025
14 14 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:19 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/22/2025. (tls)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.
13 13 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Thu 05/01 3:09 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+]. Objections Due By 05/22/2025. (accc)
Related: [-] #11 Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Multi Pig, Inc.
12 12 court Notice of Bar Date - 14 day Thu 05/01 2:17 PM
Error: Notice of Bar Date Entered in Error. Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/15/2025. (tls)Modified on 5/1/2025 (ccc)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 U.S.C. § 366(b) filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.
court Entered in Error Thu 05/01 2:31 PM
Entered in Error Bar date entered in error Related [+] (tls)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Bar Date for Objections
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 motion Employ Professional Person Wed 04/30 2:35 PM
Application to Employ Professional Person Jeffrey D. Goetz of Dickinson, Bradshaw, Fowler & Hagen, P.C., as General Reorganization Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 motion Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b) Tue 04/29 3:59 PM
Motion for Continuation of Utility Service under 11 U.S.C. § 366(b) Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/27 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/27/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney for Debtor Fri 04/25 3:14 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 court 341 Meeting - Ch11 - Business Fri 04/25 2:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference Call. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/28/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/2/2025. (ccc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 motion Joint Administration Thu 04/24 4:36 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 2:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brennan Eddie on behalf of Multi Pig, Inc...(Eddie, Brennan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 2:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elissa M Holman on behalf of Multi Pig, Inc...(Holman, Elissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 1 pgs misc List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Thu 04/24 11:45 AM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.. (ccc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Resolution Wed 04/23 6:27 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs court Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Wed 04/23 6:01 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738 Filed by Multi Pig, Inc.. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 04/23 6:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-00678 11] ) [court,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4894639. Fee amount 1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1