Pashman v. Adair et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-02171 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2015 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Thu 10/17 10:10 AM
LETTER to Court Clerk from Plaintiff re copies and counsel. (LH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Tue 03/19 12:57 PM
LETTER to Clerk from Rachel Pashman re Canteen deposits commandeered by Social Worker... . (DRM) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
minord
Minute Order
Thu 06/04 9:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 6/4/2015. A document requesting a Court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter (see F.R.C.P. 7). Letters to a judge will be disregarded. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Att: 1 correspondence received 6/1/15 | ||
Tuesday, May 12, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/12 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Valerie Adair, Fran Fine, Sheri Stanton, Steven Wolfson, filed by Rachel Pashman. (MMM) |
|
Att: 1 statement | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 05/12 12:18 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Fran Fine, Sheri Stanton, Steven Wolfson, Valerie Adair against Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Screening Order
Tue 05/12 12:03 PM
SCREENING ORDER. ORDERED that1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. The clerk shall file the complaint. The complaint is dismissed in its entirety for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's outstanding motions2 ,3 ,4 ,5 ,10 ,12 ,13 , and14 are denied as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a habeas corpus petition and an in forma pauperis application in a new action, but she may not file any further documents in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that this Court certifies that any in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken "in good faith" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: blank forms w/instructions to plaintiff - MMM) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 05/07 11:15 AM
MOTION to Combine All Related Case Numbers by Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Responses due by 5/23/2015. (MMM) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/07 11:08 AM
MOTION to Discontinue Use of Deadly Force by Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Responses due by 5/23/2015. (MMM) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/20 2:51 PM
MOTION to Supply Jusitifcation for Incarceration of Federally Recognized Justice (Judge) Rachel Leah Pashman by Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Responses due by 5/4/2015. (MMM) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
minord
Minute Order
Thu 04/02 3:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 4/2/2015. A document requesting a Court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter (see F.R.C.P. 7). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Att: 1 correspondence received 4/1/15 | ||
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
minord
Minute Order
Mon 03/30 12:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 3/30/2015. The Court will notify you as soon as any action is taken in your case. Due to the large number of civil actions pending before the Court, THE CLERK IS UNABLE TO RESPOND IN WRITING TO INDIVIDUAL INQUIRIES REGARDING THE STATUS OF YOUR CASE. As long as you keep the Court apprised of your current address, you will receive all Court decisions which might affect the status of your case. If you have not submitted a document required in your case, the Court will notify you. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 03/30 3:58 PM
MOTION to Stop Interference With Implementation of Court Orders by Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Responses due by 4/12/2015. (MMM) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Letter for Status Request
Mon 03/30 12:30 PM
LETTER requesting status from Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. (MMM) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
minord
Minute Order
Tue 03/24 8:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 3/24/2015. A document requesting a Court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter (see F.R.C.P. 7). Letters to a judge will be disregarded. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Att: 1 correspondence received 3/20/15 | ||
Thursday, February 26, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
minord
Minute Order
Thu 02/26 11:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 2/26/2015. A document requesting a Court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter (see F.R.C.P. 7). Letters to a judge will be disregarded. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Att: 1 correspondence received 2/25/15 | ||
Wednesday, February 25, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/26 10:33 AM
MOTION to End All Incarceration by Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Responses due by 3/14/2015. (MMM) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/26 10:31 AM
MOTION Suppress All Fabricated Evidence by Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Responses due by 3/14/2015. (MMM) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/26 10:30 AM
MOTION Stop Torture Immediately by Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Responses due by 3/14/2015. (MMM) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/26 10:29 AM
MOTION Disbar Justice Vallerie Adair and Justice Fran Fine by Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Responses due by 3/14/2015. (MMM) |
|
Friday, December 19, 2014 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 12/22 11:34 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rachel Pashman. Motion ripe 12/19/2014.(SLR) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Statement |