William Hare et al. v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02664 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 5:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Hare
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Hare
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago |
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 05/05 3:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(Associated as of 3/28/2025), William Hare and Stephanie Hare v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02664-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern District of Alabama (moor) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (moor) |
|
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12357251.), filed by Stephanie Hare, William Hare. Service due by 6/26/2025(moor) |