Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tiffany P Geyer
Case #: 6:25-bk-02804
Case Filed:May 09, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
First American Capital Corporation
219 Pasadena Pl
Orlando, FL 32803-3827
Represented By
Justin M Luna
Latham, Luna, Eden & Beaudine, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
11 11 motion Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event) (BK) Tue 05/13 3:51 PM
Motion for Leave to Attend Hearing Remotely for Good Cause Shown Filed by Luke Thomas Jacobs on behalf of Creditor Constitution Credit LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] 10
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Tue 05/13 3:37 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Expedited Motion to Dismiss Case or, in the alternative, Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by Peter A Tappert on behalf of Creditor Constitution Credit LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 02:30 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Tappert, Peter)
Related: [-] 9
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Tue 05/13 2:03 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 5/21/2025 2:30 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Expedited Motion to Dismiss Case., or in the alternative Motion for Prospective Relief from Stay. Re: 219 Pasadena Place, Orlando, FL 32803. Doc9 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Peter A Tappert to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, May 12, 2025
9 9 motion Motion for Relief from Stay (not for amended motions) Mon 05/12 5:38 PM
Expedited Motion to Dismiss Case ., or in the alternative Motion for Prospective Relief from Stay. Re: 219 Pasadena Place, Orlando, FL 32803. Filed by Peter A Tappert on behalf of Creditor Constitution Credit LLC
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Promissory Note
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Second Mortgage and Cross-Default and Collateralization Agreement
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Property Tax Printout
8 8 court Notice of Deficient Filing (BK) Mon 05/12 1:16 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Assets, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Declaration Concerning Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Case Management Summary . (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only) Mon 05/12 10:52 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Wanda D Murray on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Murray, Wanda)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/12 10:38 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Peter A Tappert on behalf of Creditor Constitution Credit LLC. (Tappert, Peter)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Prior Bankruptcy Case(s) Mon 05/12 7:54 AM
Prior Bankruptcy Case(s) Debtor Case No NoteFirst American Capital Corporation 24-05372 Ch11 filed in Florida Middle on 10/02/2024, Dismissed for Other Reason on 03/03/2025 .(Admin)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Mon 05/12 5:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK:6:25-bk-02804-TPG] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A79596655, Amount Paid $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business Fri 05/09 11:58 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Fri 05/09 7:01 PM
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Justin M Luna on behalf of Debtor First American Capital Corporation. (Luna, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 05/09 6:57 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Justin M Luna on behalf of Debtor First American Capital Corporation. (Luna, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 05/09 6:56 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Justin M Luna on behalf of First American Capital Corporation. Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/8/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 09/8/2025. (Luna, Justin)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Fri 05/09 6:58 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:25-bk-02804] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A79575281, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 05/09 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]