Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC et v. UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10979
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10979
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:14-ap-51002 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2014 |
Dismissed: | Jun 15, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 01, 2015 |
Last checked: never |
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC
|
|
Defendant
UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee
1010 Grand Blvd.
Kansas City, MO 64106 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EFIH Finance Inc.
Energy Plaza 1601 Bryan Street
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 07/01 8:27 AM
Adversary Case 14-51002 Closed by Deputy Clerk. (JAF) |
||
Monday, June 15, 2015 | ||
43 | 43
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 06/15 1:48 PM
Order Granting UMB Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. Signed on 6/15/2015. (NAB) Modified on 6/15/2015 (JAF) |
|
42 | 42
31
pgs
court
Opinion
Mon 06/15 1:40 PM
OPINION (CAS) |
|
Saturday, May 16, 2015 | ||
41 | 41
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/17 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 05/16/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Transcript
Thu 05/14 3:00 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 5/4/15 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/12/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext Legal Solutions, Telephone number 212-287-6868.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/21/2015. Redaction Request Due By 6/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/15/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/12/2015. (LAM) |
|
39 | 39 Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Carol Zhang of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 4, 2015 Starting at 9:30 a.m. (EDT)) Filed by EFIH Finance Inc., Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
Thursday, April 30, 2015 | ||
38 | 38
34
pgs
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Thu 04/30 4:39 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 5/4/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Wed 04/29 12:02 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 5/4/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/27 2:19 PM
Affidavit of Service (of Christina Siguenza re: Notice of Second Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 14, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.) [Re: Docket No. 4135 & Docket No. 31] Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (Madron, Jason) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/27 2:17 PM
Affidavit of Service (of Christina Siguenza re: Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 14, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.) [Re: Docket No. 4113 & Docket No. 30] Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (Madron, Jason) |
|
34 | 34 Affidavit of Service (of Christina Siguenza re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 14, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.) [Re: Docket No. 4086 and Docket No. 28] Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
Sunday, April 19, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 04/20 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/19/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Transcript
Fri 04/17 9:15 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/14/15 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/16/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext Legal Solutions, Telephone number 212-287-6868.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/24/2015. Redaction Request Due By 5/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/18/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/16/2015. (LAM) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2015 | ||
31 | 31 Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2015 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) | |
Friday, April 10, 2015 | ||
30 | 30 Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) | |
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
29 | 29 Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Christina Siguenza of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 14, 2015 starting at 9:30 a.m. (EDT)) Filed by EFIH Finance Inc., Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
Wednesday, April 08, 2015 | ||
28 | 28 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) | |
Thursday, March 19, 2015 | ||
27 | 27 3 pgs Notice of Completion of Briefing. Judge Sontchi is reviewing this case Filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee (Lemisch, Raymond) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 18, 2015 | ||
26 | 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 03/18/2015. (Admin.) | |
25 | 25 Letter referring to the Omnibus Objection to Claims (Debtors' Sixth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to (Insufficient Documentation) Claims Pursuant to Section 502(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3001, 3003, and 3007, and Local Bankruptcy Rule 3007-1)in the lead case # 14-10979 related document in lead case 3212 , 3389 , 3926 . Filed by JoAnn M. Robinson. (JAF) | |
Monday, March 16, 2015 | ||
24 | 24 Affidavit/Declaration of Service (of Christina Siguenza re: Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 10, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.) Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
23 | 23 Affidavit/Declaration of Service (of Christina Siguenza re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 10, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.) Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
22 | 22 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 3/10/2015 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/15/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/23/2015. Redaction Request Due By 4/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/16/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/15/2015. (BJM) | |
Thursday, March 12, 2015 | ||
21 | 21 Request for Oral Argument Filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee . (Lemisch, Raymond) | |
Monday, March 09, 2015 | ||
20 | 20 Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 3/10/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) | |
Friday, March 06, 2015 | ||
19 | 19 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 3/10/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) | |
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
18 | 18 25 pgs Reply in Further Support of UMB Bank, N.A.s Motion to Dismiss Filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee (Lemisch, Raymond) | |
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
17 | 17 Affidavit/Declaration of Service (of Christina Siguenza re: EFIH Debtors' Opposition to UMB Bank N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss and Declaration of Jason M. Madron, Esq. in Support of the EFIH Debtors' Opposition to UMB Bank N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss) Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
Thursday, February 26, 2015 | ||
16 | 16 Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Christina Siguenza of Epiq Bankrptcy Solutions, LLC (Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 10, 2015 starting at 9:30 a.m.) Filed by EFIH Finance Inc., Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
15 | 15 Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Carol Zhang of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 10, 2015 starting at 9:30 a.m.) Filed by EFIH Finance Inc., Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
Monday, February 23, 2015 | ||
14 | 14 Declaration in Support (Declaration of Jason M. Madron, Esq. in Support of the EFIH Debtors' Opposition to UMB Bank N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss) Filed by EFIH Finance Inc., Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
13 | 13 23 pgs Response (EFIH Debtors' Opposition to UMB Bank N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss) Filed by EFIH Finance Inc., Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC (Madron, Jason) | |
Saturday, February 14, 2015 | ||
12 | 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 02/14/2015. (Admin.) | |
Thursday, February 12, 2015 | ||
11 | 11 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 2/10/2015 RE: Pretrial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/13/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/19/2015. Redaction Request Due By 3/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/16/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/13/2015. (BJM) | |
10 | 10 Certification of Counsel Substituting Corrected UMB Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Proposed Order Granting UMB Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Due to Scrivener's Errors Filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee. (Lemisch, Raymond) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, February 09, 2015 | ||
9 | 9 Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 2/10/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) | |
Friday, February 06, 2015 | ||
8 | 8 30+ pgs Memorandum of Law in Support of UMB Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee. (Lemisch, Raymond) | |
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7 2 pgs Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee . (Lemisch, Raymond) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 2/10/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) | |
Friday, January 16, 2015 | ||
5 | 5 Order Granting Stipulation Between Debtors and Debtors in Possession and UMB Bank, N.A., As Indenture Trustee To Extend The time To Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to the Complaint. Order Signed on 1/16/2015. (DMC) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, January 15, 2015 | ||
4 | 4 Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation to Extend the Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to the Complaint Filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee. (Lemisch, Raymond) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason) | |
Att: 1 Notice of ADR | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 14-51002 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7384926, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) | |
1 | 1 23 pgs Adversary case 14-51002 Complaint (Adversary Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC and EFIH Finance Inc.) by Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC, EFIH Finance Inc. against UMB Bank, N.A., as indenture trustee. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/15/2015. (Madron, Jason) | |
Att: 1 167 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |