Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund et al v. Marbella Flooring, Inc. et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:11-cv-00510 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2011 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2012 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2017 2:02 AM PST |
Plaintiff
Bricklayers & Allied Caftworkers Local 13 Nevada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13Defined Contribution Pension Trust for Southern Nevada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund
The Urban Law Firm 4270 S. Decatur Blvd. Ste. A-9
Las Vegas, NV 89103 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Robert Imus
Terminated: 08/20/2012
|
|
Defendant
Marbella Flooring, Inc.
Terminated: 12/02/2011
|
|
Defendant
Robert Olmos
Terminated: 12/02/2011
|
Docket last updated: 04/05/2011 5:00 PM PDT |