Medsquire LLC v. Spring Medical Systems Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:11-cv-04504 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2011 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2012 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 25, 2016 5:45 PM PST |
Counter Claimant
Compulink Business Systems Inc
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
eClinicalworks LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Henry Schein Medical Systems Inc
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Pulse Systems Inc
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Medsquire LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Medsquire LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
Nextgen Healthcare Information Systems Inc
Terminated: 01/11/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Navinet Inc
Terminated: 12/01/2011
|
|
Defendant
successEHS Inc
Terminated: 09/30/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
eClinicalworks LLC
Terminated: 12/01/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
athenaHealth Inc
Terminated: 12/01/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Spring Medical Systems Inc
Terminated: 10/07/2011
|
|
Defendant
Quest Diagnostics Inc
Terminated: 03/26/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pulse Systems Inc
Terminated: 12/01/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nextgen Healthcare Information Systems Inc
Terminated: 12/01/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nextech Systems Inc
Terminated: 05/31/2011
|
|
Defendant
Med3000 Inc
Terminated: 12/01/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hewlett-Packard Company
Terminated: 11/17/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Henry Schein Medical Systems Inc
Terminated: 12/01/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Compulink Business Systems Inc
Terminated: 12/01/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aprima Medical Software Inc
Terminated: 12/01/2011
|
Represented By
|