|
GPO
Jun 02 2011
ORDER re 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/1/2011. ( Filing Deadline: 7/5/2011).(Lundstrom, T)
|
|
GPO
Aug 23 2011
ORDER REGARDING 7 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/23/2011. (Attachments: # (1) IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
|
|
GPO
Sep 14 2011
ORDER GRANTING 9 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/14/2011. (Jessen, A)
|
|
GPO
Sep 14 2011
INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/14/2011. (Jessen, A)
|
|
GPO
Sep 19 2011
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Submit USM-285 Forms Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/19/2011. Service is appropriate for United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Summons Form, # (2) USM Civil Instructions). (Jessen, A)
|
|
GPO
Sep 26 2011
ORDER Directing Service By The United States Marshal Without Prepayment Of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/23/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
|
GPO
Oct 03 2011
SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/13/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
|
GPO
Dec 07 2011
ORDER setting mandatory scheduling conference signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/6/2011. ( Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
|
|
GPO
Nov 27 2012
ORDER RESETTING Matter for December 17, 2012 re Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 23), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/27/2012. The motion hearing is reset from 12/3/2012 to 12/17/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Arellano, S.)
|
|
GPO
Dec 13 2012
ORDER VACATING hearing date of December 17, 2012 and taking matter under submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/12/2012. (Figueroa, O)
|
|
GPO
Jan 09 2013
ORDER GRANTING 23 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/8/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
|