United States of America et al v. ManTech International Corporation
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:13-cv-09173 |
Nature of Suit | 375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act |
Cause | 31:3729 False Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2013 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 26, 2014 5:49 AM PST |
Defendant
ManTech International Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Cody
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Muge Cody
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Tue 04/12 8:23 AM
RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer to Eastern District of Virginia case 1:16cv132 filed 2/10/16. (sm) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Change Venue
Tue 02/09 3:19 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Transferring Action by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants' Motion to Transfer This Action to the Eastern District of Virginia18 is granted. 2. The Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. (lom) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/27 1:09 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by the Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the courts own motion, the Motion to Transfer this Action to the Eastern District of Virginia18 , currently set for hearing on April 30, 2015, is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearances are required on April 30, 2015. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/20 9:55 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the MOTION to Transfer18 is hereby continued for hearing to 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/13 3:48 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the MOTION to Change Venue18 is continued for hearing to 4/23/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 04/02 3:28 PM
REPLY in Support of MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Virginia18 filed by Defendant ManTech International Corporation.(Farhat, Vince) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration [Supplemental] of Bonnie Cook | ||
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/30 1:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Virginia18 filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Cody, Muge Cody.(Harrington, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Muge Cody, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 20, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/23 11:43 AM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven D. Gordon on behalf of Defendant, designating Vince L. Farhat as local counsel. (lt) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order
Fri 03/20 2:28 PM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION19 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. ManTech shall have twenty-one (21) days following the entry of this Court's order on Defendant ManTech International Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer this Action to the Eastern District of Virginia to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (vdr) |
|
21 | 21
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/20 6:30 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Muge Cody, Kevin Cody. upon ManTech International Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/10/2015, answer due 5/9/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Steven D. Gordon. (Harrington, John) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/19 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ManTech International Corporation, identifying Kevin Cody and Muge Cody (Plaintiffs); ManTech International Corporation (Defendant); Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Defendant's Insurance Carrier). (Farhat, Vince) |
|
19 | 19
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 03/19 4:53 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File to Answer of Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendant ManTech International Corporation.(Farhat, Vince) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Change Venue
Thu 03/19 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Virginia filed by Defendant ManTech International Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin.(Farhat, Vince) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Bonnie Cook, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/19 4:37 PM
APPLICATION for attorney Steven D. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant ManTech International Corporation.(Attorney Vince L Farhat added to party ManTech International Corporation(pty:dft))(Farhat, Vince) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 21, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 6 pgs ORDER ON UNITED STATES' NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that the Complaint be UNSEALED and served upon the defendant by the qui tam plaintiffs; All other contents of the Court's file in this action remain under seal and not be made public or served upon the defendant, except for this Order and the United States' Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, which the relators will serve upon the defendant only after or at the same time as service of the complaint. The seal be LIFTED as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. (SEE ATTACHMENT ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp) | |
Tuesday, November 18, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 7 pgs UNITED STATES' NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION. (jp) Modified on 11/25/2014 (jp). | |
Friday, August 15, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER EXTENDING SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD. (mat) | |
Thursday, August 14, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 SEALED DOCUMENT- STIPULATION Requesting Extension of Seal and United States' Election Period. (mat) | |
Thursday, February 13, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER Extending Seal and United States' Election Period. (mat) | |
Tuesday, February 11, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 SEALED DOCUMENT- STIPULATION Extending Seal and United States' Election Period. (mat) | |
Thursday, January 16, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney R. Scott Oswald on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating David L. Scher as local counsel. (lt) | |
7 | 7 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John T. Harrington on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating David L. Scher as local counsel. (lt) | |
Wednesday, January 15, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 APPLICATION for attorney John T. Harrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Cody, Muge Cody. Lodged SEALED Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attorney John T Harrington added to party Kevin Cody(pty:pla), Attorney John T Harrington added to party Muge Cody(pty:pla))(lt) | |
5 | 5 APPLICATION for attorney Robert Scott Oswald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Cody, Muge Cody. Lodged SEALED Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attorney Robert Scott Oswald added to party Kevin Cody(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Scott Oswald added to party Muge Cody(pty:pla))(lt) | |
Thursday, December 19, 2013 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY | |
Monday, December 16, 2013 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to R. Scott Oswald for Plaintiffs Kevin Cody, Muge Cody. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) | |
Thursday, December 12, 2013 | ||
2 | 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Cody, Muge Cody. (et) (mg). | |
1 | 1 42 pgs COMPLAINT against Defendant ManTech International Corporation. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H Segal. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.), filed by Plaintiffs Muge Cody, Kevin Cody. [Summons not Issued on 12/12/2013.](et) (mg). Modified on 12/19/2013 (mg). (mg). Modified on 11/25/2014 (jp). | |
Att: 1 1 pgs (12/19/2013) Notice of Assignment | ||
Att: 2 (12/19/2013) Civil Cover Sheet |