Norfolk County Retirement System v. Community Health Systems, Inc. et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Eli J Richardson |
Referred: | Joe Brown |
Case #: | 3:11-cv-00433 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2011 |
Re-opened: | Jan 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2016 9:34 AM CDT |
Consol Defendant
Thomas Mark Buford
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
De Zheng
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
AIMCo/Boston
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Minneapolis Firefighters' Relief Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wayne T. Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
W. Larry Cash
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Community Health Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
General Retirement System of the City of Detroit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alberta Investment Management Corp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NYC Funds
One North Broadway, Suite 509
White Plains, NY 10601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New York City Employees' Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New York City Fire Department Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New York City Police Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New York City Teachers' Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New York City Teachers' Retirement System Variable Annuity Program
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norfolk County Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State-Boston Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal court certifies $891M lawsuit against Community Health Systems (nashvillepost.com) |
Submitted Wed 08/14/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
464 | 464
6
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/03 11:34 AM
ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION PLAN AND DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/3/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ln) |
|
463 | 463
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 05/03 11:32 AM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is "Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Payment of Net Settlement Fund" (Doc. No.460 , "Motion"). The Court finds that the Motion is well-taken, and so it is hereby GRANTED. The Court will separately enter the corresponding order proposed by Plaintiffs (Doc. No.461 -2), which reflects in more detail the effect of the Court's grant herein of the Motion. This case has long been closed administratively, and it will remain closed administratively. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/3/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ln) |
|
Thursday, April 28, 2022 | ||
462 | 462
misc
Declaration
Thu 04/28 11:27 AM
DECLARATION of Adam D. Walter filed by NYC Funds re:460 MOTION Approval of Distribution Plan and Payment of Net Settlement Fund .(Harrison, David) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Service | ||
461 | 461
16
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Thu 04/28 11:25 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of460 MOTION Approval of Distribution Plan and Payment of Net Settlement Fund filed by NYC Funds .(Harrison, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Proposed Order | ||
460 | 460
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/28 11:21 AM
MOTION Approval of Distribution Plan and Payment of Net Settlement Fund by NYC Funds. (Harrison, David) |