Sandoval v. Danko
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger T Benitez |
Referred: | Karen S Crawford |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-03019 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 27, 2015 6:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Priscella Danko
|
|
Plaintiff
Grace L Sandoval
759 Eighth Avenue
San DIego, CA 92101 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, March 19, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Thu 03/19 3:56 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Roger T. Benitez Rejecting Document: Ex Parte Letter, from Plaintiff Grace L Sandoval. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex Parte Communication; No Proof of Service; Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/17/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (sjt) |
|
Att: 1 (3/19/2015) Rejected Document | ||
Wednesday, January 14, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 01/16 1:00 PM
ORDER: (1) Denying3 Motion to Proceed IFP; and (2) Denying2 Motion to Appoint Counsel as Moot. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date this Order is filed to pay the filing fee or file a new motion to proceed IFP. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/12/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb) |
|
5 | 5
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Fri 01/16 12:55 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Roger T. Benitez Rejecting Document: Ex Parte Letter re Filomena Dutra, from Plaintiff Grace L Sandoval. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex Parte Communication is Prohibited; No Proof of Service; No provision for acceptance, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/12/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb) (knb) |
|
Att: 1 (1/16/2015) Letter | ||
4 | 4
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Fri 01/16 12:53 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Roger T. Benitez Rejecting Document: Ex Parte Letter re Polinsky Children's Center, from Plaintiff Grace L Sandoval. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex Parte Communication is Prohibited; No Proof of Service, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/12/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb) (knb) |
|
Att: 1 (1/16/2015) Letter | ||
Monday, December 29, 2014 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 12/30 8:55 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Grace L Sandoval. (fth) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 12/30 8:55 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Grace L Sandoval. (fth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/30 8:54 AM
COMPLAINT against Priscella Danko, IFP Filed, filed by Grace L Sandoval. The new case number is 3:14-cv-3019-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(fth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |