|
GPO
Jul 18 2011
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that plaintiff's claims for declaratory relief with respect to orders/actions of the state court be DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that plaintiff's claims relative to the pending criminal charges be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); that this case be dismissed prior to service of process; Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2011. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/18/2011. (cc, )
|
|
GPO
Sep 14 2011
ORDER overruling plaintiff's 6 Objection; that 5 Report and Recommendations is adopted; that plaintiff's claims relative to the pending criminal charges are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); that this case is DISMISSED prior to service of process. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/14/2011. (cc, )
|
|
GPO
Sep 14 2011
FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff and that this action is dismissed with prejudice; that the clerk is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/14/2011. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, )
|