United States of America v. $116,381.44 in US Currency et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David K Duncan |
Case #: | 2:11-cv-01421 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2011 |
Terminated: | Nov 04, 2011 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 14, 2017 11:52 PM MST |
Defendant
$116,381.44 in US Currency
|
|
Defendant
$14,301.34 in US Currency
|
|
Defendant
$22,958.94 in US Currency
|
|
Defendant
$45,696.85 in US Currency
|
|
Defendant
$5,187.87 in US Currency
|
|
Defendant
$89,631.64 in US Currency
|
|
Defendant
$96,176.99 in US Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/17/2011 5:00 PM MST |
Monday, July 18, 2011 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT, filed by United States of America (submitted by Paul Rood).(REK) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K. Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 11-01421 PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK) | |
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form |