CREDICO MARKETING, INC. et al v. HOGG
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gene Ek Pratter |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00051 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 06, 2015 8:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER ROUGHTON HOGG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CREDICO MARKETING, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CRISTOMEL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 02/19 4:14 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING DISMISSAL OF CASE WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/19/16. 2/19/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, ) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order
Thu 01/28 1:56 PM
ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT STATUS REPORT NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 5, 2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/28/16. 1/28/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Status Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 12/30 3:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER Status Conference held on 12/30/15. (rf, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 12/22 11:25 AM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 12/30/2015 10:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(rab, ) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 12/17 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/29/2015 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(rab, ) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 12/10 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, DECEMBER 14, 2015 AT 10:30 A.M. (rab, ) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Pretrial Memorandum
Thu 12/10 12:43 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by CHRISTOPHER ROUGHTON HOGG 12/10/15. (BANKS, DAVID) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Pretrial Memorandum
Fri 11/06 12:02 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by CREDICO MARKETING, INC., CRISTOMEL, INC. Certificate of Service. (TRELA, REBECCA) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 11/06 11:43 AM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2015 10:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(rab, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 11/06 11:44 AM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: TRIAL POOL SET FOR 12/22/2015. (rab, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Sanctions Seal Document
Tue 10/20 4:27 PM
MOTION for Sanctions , MOTION to Seal Document21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CREDICO MARKETING, INC., CRISTOMEL, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service.(TRELA, REBECCA) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 10/19 3:17 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CREDICO MARKETING, INC., CRISTOMEL, INC..Statement of Undisputed Facts, Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(TRELA, REBECCA) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/16 10:09 AM
ORDER granting19 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OR JURA C. ZIBAS ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/15/15.10/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rab, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/14 2:32 PM
Amended MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jura C. Zibas, Esquire filed by CREDICO MARKETING, INC., CRISTOMEL, INC..Affidavits, Certificate of Service.(TRELA, REBECCA) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Wed 10/14 2:32 PM
ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A THREE-DAY EXTENSION OF THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINE IS GRANTED. ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMNT SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 19, 2015. RESPONSES TO ANY SUCH MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED WITHIN 21 DAYS AFTER SERVICE OF THE MOTION. THIS EXTENSION WILL BE NOT AFFECT ANY OTHER DEADLINE IN THE MAY 28, 2015 SCHEDULINLG ORDER (DOCKET NO. 14).. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/13/15. 10/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, ) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 10/14 10:50 AM
ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JURA C. ZIBAS (DOC. 16) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/13/15. 10/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/14 2:33 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/19/2015. (rab, ) |
||
Monday, October 12, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/12 2:34 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jura C. Zibas, Esquire filed by CREDICO MARKETING, INC., CRISTOMEL, INC..Affidavits, Certificate of Service.(TRELA, REBECCA) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/18 1:06 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS 9/17/15 CORRESPONDENCE REQUESTING 2 WEEK EXTENSION OF THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINE IS GRANTED. ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE 10/16/15, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/18/15. 9/18/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/29 9:34 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/17/2015 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/11/2015. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/2/2015. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/6/2015. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/13/2015. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 11/24/2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/28/15. 5/29/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, ) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 05/28 4:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/28/15 (rf, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Praecipe/Request
Wed 05/27 8:50 AM
Substitution of Counsel by CREDICO MARKETING, INC., CRISTOMEL, INC.. (TRELA, REBECCA) |
|
Friday, March 13, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 03/13 2:38 PM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 5/28/2015 03:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(rab, ) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/12 11:21 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, together with with Affirmative Defenses by CHRISTOPHER ROUGHTON HOGG.(BANKS, DAVID) |
|
Monday, February 23, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 02/23 2:29 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER ROUGHTON HOGG AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE HIS ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT UNTIL MARCH 12, 2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/23/15. 2/23/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 18, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
Wed 02/18 5:10 PM
STIPULATION to file an Answer to the Complaint by CHRISTOPHER ROUGHTON HOGG. (BANKS, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, February 11, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/11 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID BANKS on behalf of CHRISTOPHER ROUGHTON HOGG (BANKS, DAVID) |
|
Monday, February 09, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 02/09 2:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Eric Kramer re: served Summons and Complaint upon Christopher Roughton Hogg by Personal service on 02/05/2015 (RACOWSKI, KENNETH) |
|
Monday, January 26, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Mon 01/26 9:43 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CREDICO MARKETING, INC., CRISTOMEL, INC..(RACOWSKI, KENNETH) |
|
Wednesday, January 14, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 01/14 1:37 PM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 3/16/2015 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(rab, ) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 01/14 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/13/2015 11:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(rab, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/14/2015) (rab, ) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 01/14 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/16/2015 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(rab, ) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement | ||
Wednesday, January 07, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/08 9:03 AM
COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER ROUGHTON HOGG ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 114049.), filed by CREDICO MARKETING, INC., CRISTOMEL, INC..(rt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form, | ||
Att: 4 Designation Form | ||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/08 9:15 AM
Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER ROUGHTON HOGG. One Forwarded To: Counsel on January 8, 2015 (rt) |