Osorio-Arellanes v. USA
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David C Bury |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-00008 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 09, 2015 1:21 AM MST |
Petitioner
Manuel Osorio-Arellanes
# 11869-308 MENDOTA-CA-MENDOTA-FCI FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P.O. BOX 9
MENDOTA, CA 93640 |
|
Respondent
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 12/13 3:38 PM
ORDER of USCA re:9 Notice of Appeal filed by Manuel Osorio-Arellanes.The request for a certificate of appealability is denied. Any pending motions are denied as moot. DENIED. (See attached PDF for complete information(. (Attachments: #1 NDA)(BAR) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 07/26 3:58 PM
USCA Case Number re:9 Notice of Appeal. Case number 16-16306 9th CCA. (KAH) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 07/22 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:8 Clerks Judgment by Manuel Osorio-Arellanes. (1 page) (KAH) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Clerks Judgment
Wed 06/29 4:08 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's Order filed June 29, 2016, movant's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside or correct a sentence is denied and the civil action opened in connection is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (DPS) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Wed 06/29 4:04 PM
ORDER: Petitioner's Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody, (Doc. 332) filed in CR 11-150-TUC-DCB and (Doc.1 ) filed in CV 15-0008 TUC-DCB is DENIED. Civil case number CV 15-0008 TUC-DCB is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Petitioner's motions for copies of transcripts for the plea and sentencing hearings (Docs. 318 and 322 ) filed in CR 11-150-TUC-DCB are DENIED. The Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 6/28/2016. (DPS) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Reply to Response to Motion (2255)
Tue 06/23 11:54 AM
REPLY TO4 Response to Motion (2255) filed by Manuel Osorio-Arellanes. (4 pages) (attached document is the same as document #5 on docket, with the exception that this one is signed by the Movant) (DLC) |
|
Monday, June 15, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Reply to Response to Motion (2255)
Wed 06/17 8:26 AM
REPLY TO4 Response to Motion (2255) filed by Manuel Osorio-Arellanes. (4 pages) (DLC) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Response to Motion (2255)
Mon 06/01 12:31 PM
RESPONSE TO1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) . filed by USA.(Leshner, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order (Service Packet) ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Case No Longer Referred
Wed 04/01 6:17 PM
ORDER: (Service Packet). IT IS ORDERED the Clerk must serve a copy of the §2255 Motion (Doc. 1 in CV 15-0008 TUC-DCB) and this Order on the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona. The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the §2255 Motion in the civil case. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/31/15.(BAC) |
|
Thursday, January 08, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Thu 01/08 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (DLC) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Thu 01/08 4:37 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No 4:11-CR-00150-TUC-DCB-BPV-1 filed by Manuel Osorio-Arellanes. (15 pages)(DLC) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of 2255, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |