Lawrie et al v. The Ginn Companies, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Corrigan |
Referred: | Joel B Toomey |
Case #: | 3:09-cv-00446 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 20, 2009 |
Re-opened: | Oct 18, 2012 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2014 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 17, 2015 8:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ginn Title Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ginn Development Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lubert-Adler Partners, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fifth Third Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fifth Third Bancorp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.
Rogers Towers, P.A. 1301 Riverplace Blvd. Suite 1500
Jacksonville, FL 32207 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wachovia Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Petts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gordon Lawrie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Sobel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Tipton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles McKinlay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Lawrie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Frieze
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Frieze
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Button
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlotte Billington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Billington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Naomi Berger
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Ginn Real Estate Company, LLC
Terminated: 11/08/2010
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ginn Financial Services, LLC
Terminated: 11/08/2010
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ESI Living, LLC
Terminated: 11/08/2010
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ESI Living, Inc.
Terminated: 09/05/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Ginn Companies, LLC
Terminated: 11/08/2010
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James C. Ramey
Terminated: 11/08/2010
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Siegel
Terminated: 11/08/2010
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Siegel
Terminated: 11/08/2010
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Migyanka
Terminated: 09/05/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Flora Migyanka
Terminated: 09/05/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Delaney
Terminated: 09/05/2013
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
323 | 323
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 09/06 11:42 AM
ORDER denying 312 Defendant ESI Living's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs' alternative motion for attorneys' fees is denied. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/6/2016. (SEJ) |