Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC v. Compsource Mutual Insurance Company
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Joe Heaton |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-00031 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 08, 2015 9:02 AM CDT |
Defendant
Compsource Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment
Tue 05/05 11:34 AM
JUDGMENT in accordance with order23 this case is dismissed. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 05/05/2015. (lam) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 05/05 11:31 AM
ORDER granting10 defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction...this case is dismissed. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 05/05/2015. (lam) |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Surreply
Wed 03/18 4:56 PM
SURREPLY re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief In Support filed by Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC. (Alexander, Robert) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Leave to
Wed 03/18 11:44 AM
ORDER granting20 plaintiff's motion for leave to file surreply...plaintiff shall file its surreply to the motion to dismiss10 not later than 03/20/2015 and is not to exceed 2 pages in length. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 03/18/2015. (lam) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Leave
Tue 03/17 3:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Address New Argument and Law Raised for the First Time in Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Doc. # 19 by Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC. (Alexander, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply
Thu 03/05 5:19 PM
REPLY by Defendant Compsource Mutual Insurance Company In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Compsource Mutual Insurance Company. (Rice, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, February 26, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/26 12:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief In Support filed by Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC. (Alexander, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 02/17 11:18 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Mark W DeLaquil on behalf of Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC (DeLaquil, Mark) |
|
Monday, February 16, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 02/16 3:26 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Lee H Rosebush on behalf of Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC (Rosebush, Lee) |
|
Monday, February 09, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/09 3:03 PM
ORDER granting11 and12 Mark W. DeLaquil, Esq., and Lee H. Rosebush, Esq., leave to proceed pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 02/09/2015. (lam) |
|
Friday, February 06, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Receipt
Fri 02/06 4:07 PM
Receipt for Money Received from Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500044749 regarding12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lee H. Rosebush (pw) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Receipt
Fri 02/06 4:06 PM
Receipt for Money Received from Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500044748 regarding11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark W. DeLaquil (pw) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
Fri 02/06 3:33 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lee H. Rosebush by Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC.(Alexander, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex-1 PHV Request-Rosebush | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
Fri 02/06 3:30 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark W. DeLaquil by Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC.(Alexander, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex-1 PHV Request-DeLaquil | ||
Monday, February 02, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 02/02 5:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief In Support by Compsource Mutual Insurance Company.(Rice, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kristi Bynum Funck | ||
9 | 9
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 02/02 5:10 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Douglas A Rice on behalf of Compsource Mutual Insurance Company (Rice, Douglas) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 02/02 5:07 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen L McCaleb on behalf of Compsource Mutual Insurance Company (McCaleb, Stephen) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 02/02 5:05 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Larry Derryberry on behalf of Compsource Mutual Insurance Company (Derryberry, Larry) |
|
Wednesday, January 14, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Entry of Appearance
Wed 01/14 8:56 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Robert H Alexander, Jr on behalf of Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC (Alexander, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, January 13, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Tue 01/13 2:52 PM
ENTER ORDER directing counsel for plaintiff to file an entry of appearance in accordance with LCvR83.4 not later than 01/15/2015. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/13/2015. (lam) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 01/13 9:44 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC. (Alexander, Robert) |
|
Friday, January 09, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement - LLC
Fri 01/09 4:43 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC . (Alexander, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/09 3:58 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Compsource Mutual Insurance Company. (cla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/09 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Compsource Mutual Insurance Company filed by Injured Workers Pharmacy LLC.(cla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Fri 01/09 4:10 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-1995718. (Alexander, Robert) |