Noorzai v. Dabella Exteriors, LLC
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Paul Papak |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00045 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 08, 2015 5:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dabella Exteriors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hewad Noorzai
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Terminate Case
Tue 08/25 11:36 AM
Judgment. Signed on 8/25/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Stay Order on Findings & Recommendation
Tue 08/25 11:35 AM
ORDER - The Court ADOPTS Judge Papak's Findings and Recommendation, Dkt.14 . Defendant's motion to compel arbitration (Dkt.6 ) is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED. Signed on 8/25/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) Modified on 8/25/2015 to correct Docket number for the Findings and Recommendation to14 (mja) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Findings & Recommendation Referred
Fri 07/24 3:55 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Findings & Recommendation14 is referred to Judge Michael H. Simon for review. Objections, if any, are due fourteen (14) days from service of the Findings and Recommendation. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. (gm) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Findings & Recommendation
Fri 07/24 3:52 PM
Findings & Recommendation: Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration6 should be granted. A final judgment should be prepared. Signed on 7/24/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
resp
Reply to Motion
Mon 05/04 1:12 PM
Reply to Motion for Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration 6 . Filed by Dabella Exteriors, LLC. (Naito, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Attorney Substitution
Tue 04/21 12:20 PM
Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Eric J. Fjelstad is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Kerry M. L. Smith Filed by Hewad Noorzai (Fjelstad, Eric) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
1 - Scheduling
Fri 04/17 12:26 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Compel Arbitration6 on the under advisement calendar of 5/11/2015. (gm) |
|
10 | 10
resp
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/17 9:20 AM
Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration 6 . Filed by Hewad Noorzai. (Fjelstad, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
1 - Scheduling
Tue 04/14 4:44 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: At the request of defense counsel, their Request for Oral Argument as to their Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Compel Arbitration6 is Withdrawn and the oral argument which was set for 5/12/2015 at 10:00AM is Stricken. (gm) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
1 - Scheduling
Wed 04/01 11:30 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Compel Arbitration6 on the Oral Argument Calendar of 5/12/2015 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Correction of the Record
Tue 03/31 4:46 PM
Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record: Per defense counsel, their Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Compel Arbitration was mistakenly docketed twice as both docket entry5 and docket entry6 . Docket entry5 will be stricken and entry6 will become the operative motion. (gm) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Stay
Tue 03/31 4:07 PM
Motion for Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Dabella Exteriors, LLC. (Naito, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit and Supporting Declaration | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Tue 03/31 3:33 PM
Motion for Stay and to Compel Arbitration . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Dabella Exteriors, LLC. (Summers, Brent) Modified on 3/31/2015 per Order 7 . (gm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit and Supporting Declaration | ||
Monday, January 26, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/26 1:40 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Dabella Exteriors, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (cib) |
|
3 | 3
service
Proposed Summons
Mon 01/26 1:29 PM
Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Hewad Noorzai. (Smith, Kerry) |
|
Friday, January 09, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Fri 01/09 1:59 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 5/11/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/8/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 6/8/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (cib) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/09 1:05 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3965351 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Hewad Noorzai against Dabella Exteriors, LLC. (Smith, Kerry) Modified plaintiff's name on 1/9/2015 (cib) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |