Miykael Muhammad v. Anjanette Jesse, et al
Original Case: 1:13-cv-08227
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-01044 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 02, 2015 11:42 PM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
ANJANETTE JESSE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ILLINOIS DEPARTMENT OF HEALTHCARE AND FAMILY SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARY MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PAT QUINN
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MIYKAEL MUHAMMAD, Minister, formerly known through involuntary servitude as Michael Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/02/2015 11:06 PM CDT |
Monday, January 12, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP. Docketing statement filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/23/2015 for Miykael Muhammad. Transcript information sheet due by 01/26/2015. [1] [6633594] 15-1044 (DAM) | |
2 | 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellee Pat Quinn, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [6633596] 15-1044 (DAM) |