McHenry v. Narconon Louisiana New Life Retreat et al
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | James J Brady |
Referred: | Stephen C Riedlinger |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00022 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 18, 2015 8:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Narconon Louisiana New Life Retreat
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Association For Better Living and Education International
|
|
Defendant
DOES 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Narconon Eastern United States
|
|
Defendant
Narconon International
|
|
Defendant
ROE Corporations 1-X, inclusive
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeannette McHenry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 11, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 03/11 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeannette McHenry (Pendley, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, February 26, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
9
pgs
order
90 Day Conference Order
Thu 02/26 12:13 PM
90-DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2015 at 2:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. Status Report due by 4/9/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/26/15. (BNW) |
|
Friday, February 20, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Parties - Response to Motion Deadlines (JJB)
Fri 02/20 3:22 PM
ORDER on4 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12b for Failure to Join a Party and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction: Opposition to the motion shall be filed on or before 03/13/2015. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/20/2015. (BCL) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Fri 02/20 11:26 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12b for Failure to Join a Party and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Narconon Louisiana New Life Retreat.(St. Amant, Alexis) Modified to edit text on 2/20/2015 (BCL) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Thursday, January 22, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/22 1:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Association For Better Living and Education International, Narconon Eastern United States, Narconon International, Narconon Louisiana New Life Retreat. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Not Previously Submitted
Thu 01/22 11:33 AM
Summons Submitted(Pendley, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, January 19, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Complete Case Opening First)
Mon 01/19 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Narconon Louisiana New Life Retreat ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1177141.), filed by Jeannette McHenry.(Pendley, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit |