SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. HUANG et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Kearney |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00269 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Dec 17, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 25, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 20, 2015 9:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
BONAN HUANG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NAN HUANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
BONAN HUANG
4909 WESTWARD TE
GLEN ALLEN, VA 23059 |
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
NAN HUANG
2441 HAWKESBURY CT.
RICHMOND, VA 23233 |
Represented By
|
1. | Forcing suspects to reveal phone passwords is unconstitutional, court says (arstechnica.com) |
Submitted Fri 09/25/2015 | |
2. | Judge Rules Phone Passcodes Are Protected Information (wsj.com) |
Submitted Fri 09/25/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |