Harris v. Jindal
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Tom Stagg |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-00122 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 13, 2016 9:31 PM CST |
Defendant
Bobby Jindal
|
|
Plaintiff
Fredrick Wayne Harris
494299 David Wade Correctional Center 670 Bell Hill Rd
Homer, LA 71040 |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Mon 03/09 10:23 AM
ORDER granting13 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/4/2015. (crt,Haik, K) Modified to correct file date on 3/9/2015 (Haik, K) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Wed 03/04 10:37 AM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Fredrick Wayne Harris. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
utility
Motions Transferred
Thu 03/05 10:12 AM
Motions Transferred regarding13 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss. Motions referred to Tom Stagg. (crt,Haik, K) |
||
Friday, February 27, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 03/02 11:08 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Fredrick Wayne Harris. Objections to R&R due by 3/31/2015. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 2/27/2015. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Wednesday, February 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 02/19 11:03 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Fredrick Wayne Harris. Objections to R&R due by 3/17/2015. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 2/17/2015. (crt,HaikSld, K) |
|
Monday, February 09, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Tue 02/10 10:56 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Fredrick Wayne Harris by Fredrick Wayne Harris. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (crt,HaikSld, K) |
|
utility
Motions Transferred
Tue 02/10 10:57 AM
Motions Transferred regarding9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Fredrick Wayne Harris. Motions referred to Tom Stagg. (crt,HaikSld, K) |
||
Friday, February 06, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 02/09 3:49 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/6/2014. (crt,HaikSld, K) |
|
Wednesday, February 04, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 02/05 9:02 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Fredrick Wayne Harris. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (crt,HaikSld, K) |
|
Thursday, January 29, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 01/29 3:47 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Tom Stagg. Judge S Maurice Hicks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 1/29/2015. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Wednesday, January 28, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/28 4:35 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Fredrick Wayne Harris. RECOMMENDING that Plaintiffs complaint be dismissed with prejudice asfrivolous under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2015.Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/28/15. (crt,Delgado, S) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/28 4:34 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/28/15. (crt,Delgado, S) |
|
Monday, January 26, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 01/26 3:31 PM
PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Thursday, January 22, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 01/23 10:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fredrick Wayne Harris. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/23 10:32 AM
COMPLAINT against Bobby Jindal filed by Fredrick Wayne Harris.(crt,Keller, J) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope, | ||
Att: 4 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/26 3:29 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) |