Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia v. Does 1-3
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Donna M Ryu |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-00332 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 22, 2015 6:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Does 1-3
|
|
Plaintiff
Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/29 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/29/2015) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Fri 09/18 3:58 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 21 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Early Discovery. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Ex Parte Application
Tue 06/23 2:46 PM
Ex Parte Application For Order Granting Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia.(Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/23/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Li Kim Phng ISO Ex Parte Application, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Steven Gomez ISO Ex Parte Application, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior To Rule 26 Conference | ||
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/18 11:23 AM
ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2015 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/18/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 06/17 9:54 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/17/2015) |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 06/16 2:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Does 1-3. Filed byKechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/16/2015) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 06/16 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kimberly Irene Culp (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/16/2015) |
|
Tuesday, May 19, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Tue 05/19 5:34 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 10 Ex Parte Application.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 04/16 9:16 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Case Management Conference previously set on 4/22/15 has been CONTINUED to 6/24/15 at 1:30 pm, Courtroom 4, 3rd floor, U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612. The Case Management Statement is due no later than 6/17/15. (This is a text-only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 04/15 9:41 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiff's Separate Case Management Statement filed by Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/15/2015) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
adr
Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
Mon 04/06 11:04 AM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/6/2015) |
|
12 | 12
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Mon 04/06 10:57 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/6/2015) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Mon 03/30 5:35 PM
Declaration of Steven L. Gomez in Support of10 Ex Parte Application For Order Granting Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [10-2] filed byKechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/30/2015) |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
9
pgs
motion
Ex Parte Application
Wed 03/18 3:20 PM
Ex Parte Application For Order Granting Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia.(Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/18/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Li Kim Phng ISO Ex Parte Application, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Steven Gomez ISO Ex Parte Application, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior To Rule 26 Conference | ||
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/03 4:21 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Stephanie Egner Smith's Motion admission for Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/03 4:19 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 6 Asa Hutchinson, III's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/03 10:41 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie Egner Smith ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9257589.) filed by Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/3/2015) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/03 10:32 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Asa Hutchinson, III ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9257427.) filed by Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/3/2015) |
|
Monday, January 26, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 01/26 9:30 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2015 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015) |
|
Friday, January 23, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 01/23 4:23 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia.. (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/23/2015) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 01/23 2:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons (Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/23/2015) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/23 1:08 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/23 12:48 PM
COMPLAINT for Defamation, Invasion of Privacy, Copyright Infringement, In the Alternative, Declaratory and/or Injunctive Relief against John Does 1-3 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9232433.). Filed byKechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia.(Culp, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/23/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |