United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, et al. v. Augusta Hospital, LLC
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | W Harold Albritton, III |
Referred: | Susan Russ Walker |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-01044 |
Nature of Suit | 375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act |
Cause | 31:3729 False Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2015 4:54 PM CDT |
Defendant
Augusta Hospital, LLC
|
|
Movant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, January 26, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
3
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Mon 01/26 4:05 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The Relators' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #29 ) is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; (2) The Motion to Seal Relators' Identities (Doc. #29 ) is DENIED; the Clerk is directed to unseal the Complaint in this case; all other contents of the court's file in this action remain under seal except this Memorandum Opinion and Order and shall not be made public; the seal is lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order; (3) Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/26/15.(scn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Appeals Checklist | ||
utility
Case Unsealed
Mon 01/26 4:03 PM
***Case Unsealed pursuant to37 memorandum opinion and order. (scn, ) |
||
Thursday, January 08, 2015 | ||
36 | 36 TEXT ORDER granting35 Motion for Assistant United States Attorney Edgar Bueno to Withdraw as Attorney; Attorney Edgar Bueno terminated as counsel for USA. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/8/15. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (scn, ) | |
Wednesday, January 07, 2015 | ||
35 | 35 MOTION for Assistant United States Attorney Edgar Bueno to Withdraw as Attorney, by United States of America.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
34 | 34 SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency regarding pro hac vice admission re Attorney Mark A. Tate. (scn, ) | |
33 | 33 SECOND NOTICE of Non-Compliance re Attorney Edgar Bueno.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Standing ORDER, | ||
Att: 2 Sample Form | ||
Tuesday, January 06, 2015 | ||
32 | 32 ORDER directing that the Relators are given until January 20, 2015, to file a response to the United States' Response to Relators' Motion to Dismiss and to Seal Relators' Identities, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 01/06/2015. (scn, ) | |
Tuesday, December 23, 2014 | ||
31 | 31 RESPONSE to Motion re29 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Seal Relators' Identities, filed by United States of America.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, December 19, 2014 | ||
30 | 30 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re29 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Seal Relators' Identities, filed by United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
29 | 29 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Seal Relators' Identities, by United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce. (scn, ) | |
Tuesday, November 18, 2014 | ||
28 | 28 NOTICE of Deficiency re Attorney Mark A. Tate. (scn, ) | |
27 | 27 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re Attorney Edgar Bueno. (scn, ) | |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
26 | 26 TEXT ORDER granting25 Motion for James E. Shipley, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/24/14. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (scn, ) | |
*** Attorney James Everett Shipley, Jr terminated as counsel for United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce. (scn, ) | ||
Wednesday, October 22, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 MOTION for James E. Shipley, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
24 | 24 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce. (scn, ) | |
Monday, October 20, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 TEXT ORDER granting22 Motion for John A. Day to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/20/14.(No PDF document attached to this entry.) (scn, ) | |
*** Attorney John A. Day terminated as counsel of record pursuant to 23 TEXT ORDER. (scn, ) | ||
Friday, October 17, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 MOTION for John A. Day to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle and United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 16, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (scn, ) | |
20 | 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G Anderson on behalf of United States of America. (scn, ) | |
Thursday, October 09, 2014 | ||
Case transferred in from USDC, Southern District of Georgia (Augusta); Case Number l:13-cv-00179-JRH-BK. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received via e-mail on 10/09/2014.(scn, ) | ||
Friday, April 04, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 GASD ORDER granting the Relators'18 Motion to Transfer Venue and Maintain the Seal Pending Ruling By the Transferee Court. Therefore, this case is Ordered transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a) & (b), and the case shall remain sealed until further Order of the transferee court. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/04/2014. (scn, ) | |
Case transferred to District of Middle District of Alabama. File transferred electronically. (scn, ) | ||
Thursday, April 03, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 Relators' Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Venue and Maintain the Seal Pending Ruling by the Transferee Court by United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 02, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 GASD SEALED ORDER granting the United States'16 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to intervene; and directing that the deadline for the United States to notify the Court of its decision to intervene is extended up to and including May 1,2014. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/02/2014. (scn, ) | |
(Court only) ***Staff notes - Copies of17 Order were mailed to Attorneys Edgar D. Bueno, Donald P. McKenna, Jr., James Everett Shipley, Jr., John A. Day and Scott A. Powell at their addresses on record. (scn, ) | ||
Friday, March 28, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 EX PARTE MOTION for Extension of Time to Consider Election to Intervene to and including May 1, 2014, by United States of America. Responses due by 4/14/2014.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 10, 2013 | ||
15 | 15 GASD ORDER granting United States'14 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to intervene, up to and including April 1, 2014, and14 Motion for a Partial Lifting of the Seal. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/10/2013. (scn, ) | |
Monday, December 02, 2013 | ||
14 | 14 EX PARTE MOTION/APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Consider Election to Intervene, During Which the Seal Would Be Maintained, AND for a Partial Lifting of the Seal by United States of America. (scn, ) | |
Friday, October 18, 2013 | ||
13 | 13 GASD ORDER granting John A. day's8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen (in JUdge Hall's absence) on 10/18/13. (scn, ) | |
(Court Only) *** Attorney John A. Day, Scott A. Powell, Donald P. McKenna, Jr for United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, John A. Day, Scott A. Powell, Donald P. McKenna, Jr United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce added. (scn, ) | ||
Thursday, October 17, 2013 | ||
12 | 12 GASD ORDER granting Donald P. McKenna's9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brain K. Epps on 10/17/13. (scn, ) | |
11 | 11 GASD ORDER granting Scott A. Powell's7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brain K. Epps on 10/17/13. (scn, ) | |
10 | 10 PRO HAC VICE PAID by James Everett Shipley, Jr. for Scott A. Powell, John A. day, and Donald P. McKenna, Jr.: Amount $600, Receipt # SAV018059, Date 10/16/2013. (scn, ) | |
Wednesday, October 16, 2013 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION by Donald P. McKenna, Jr. for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (scn, ) | |
8 | 8 MOTION by John A. Day for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (scn, ) | |
7 | 7 MOTION by Scott A. Powell for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (scn, ) | |
Tuesday, September 24, 2013 | ||
6 | 6 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/24/13.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Counsel Refiled or Related - REQUIRED by Local Rule 3.1, | ||
Att: 2 Disclosure Statement - REquired by Local Rule 7.1.1, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability - OPTIONAL | ||
5 | 5 GASD ORDER granting Plaintiffs'3 Motion to Seal Case Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/24/l3. (scn, ) | |
(Court Only) ***Staff notes - Copies of5 &6 Orders, along with LR3.1 Certificate of Refiled or Related Cases, LR7.1.1 Disclosure Statement, and Notice of Magistrate Judge's Availability were served by USP mail on Plaintiff's Counsel, James E. Shipley, Jr., Tate Law Group, LLC, PO Box 9060, Savannah, GA 31412. (scn, ) | ||
Monday, September 23, 2013 | ||
4 | 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights, by United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce. (scn, ) | |
3 | 3 MOTION to Seal Case by United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce. (scn, ) | |
2 | 2 Filing fee paid: $ 400.000 receipt number SAV017870. (scn, ) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Augusta Hospital, LLC, filed by United States of America ex rel Frank Coyle, United States of America ex rel Randy Bruce.(scn, ) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
(Court only) *** Case Sealed. (scn, ) |