John Urbino v. Orkin Services of California Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:11-cv-06456 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2011 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2011 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2017 11:11 AM PST |
Counter Claimant
Orkin Services of California Inc
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Rollins Inc
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
John Urbino
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Orkin Services of California Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rollins Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Urbino
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/04/2011 5:00 PM PDT |
Friday, August 05, 2011 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR REMOVAL from the Superior Court of CA, Los Angeles County, case number BC463970 with CONFORMED copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer, discovery to Magistrate Judge Andrew J Wistrich; (Filing fee $ 350 PAID ); filed by defendants Rollins Inc, Orkin Services of California Inc.(esa) Modified on 8/8/2011 (esa). (mg). | |
2 | 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants Orkin Services of California Inc, Rollins Inc. (esa) (mg). | |
3 | 3 DECLARATION of JEFFERSON BLANDFORD in support of Notice of Removal,1 filed by Defendants Orkin Services of California Inc, Rollins Inc. (esa) (mg). | |
4 | 4 DECLARATION of JOHN E LATTIN in support of Notice of Removal,1 filed by Defendants Orkin Services of California Inc, Rollins Inc. (esa) (mg). | |
5 | 5 DECLARATION of TAMERA ROBERSON in support of Notice of Removal,1 filed by Defendants Orkin Services of California Inc, Rollins Inc. (esa) (mg). | |
6 | 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES filed by defendant Orkin Services of California Inc, Rollins Inc. Related Case: SACV 11-117 CJC (PJWx) (esa) (mg). | |
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Adverse Parties filed by defendants Orkin Services of California Inc, Rollins Inc, re Notice of (s)6 , Certificate of Interested Parties2 , Notice of Filing Petition for Removal,1 , Declaration5 , Declaration4 served on 8/5/11. (esa) (mg). |