Govender et al v. Mountain State University, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | G Kendall Sharp |
Referred: | Gregory J Kelly |
Case #: | 6:11-cv-01310 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2011 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2012 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2017 6:29 AM EST |
Defendant
Mountain State University, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kamani Govender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwane Hubbart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/07/2011 8:00 PM EDT |
Monday, August 08, 2011 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9th Judicial Circuit Court for Orange County, case number 2011-CA-7652, filed in State Court on 6/22/11. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number Orl009622. Filed by Mountain State University, Inc.(CBH) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - filed in state court, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - filed in state court, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - filed in state court, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - filed in state court, | ||
Att: 6 Notice to state court of Removal | ||
2 | 2 COMPLAINT against Mountain State University, Inc. with Jury Demand, originally filed in state court on 6/22/11 by Kamani Govender, Dwane Hubbart.(CBH) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
3 | 3 RETURN of service of state issued summons, executed on 7/7/11 and filed in state court by Kamani Govender, Dwane Hubbart as to Mountain State University, Inc.. (CBH) |